Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-23174
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-02781
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2023 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
TODD SOLTAU
Represented By
EVAN D BUXNER
Gori Julian & Associates - Edwardsville Il
contact info
SAMIRA KHAZAELI
Gori Law Firm Pc - Edwardsville Il
contact info
NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD
The Gori Law Firm - Edwardsville Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 05, 2022
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/05 2:48 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by TODD SOLTAU. (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/05 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN D BUXNER on behalf of TODD SOLTAU (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/05 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD on behalf of TODD SOLTAU (MAYFIELD, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/05 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMIRA KHAZAELI on behalf of TODD SOLTAU (KHAZAELI, SAMIRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/16 10:52 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 12/6/2022 .) (Emailed to Counsel for Plaintiff, Jason B. Epps, The Gori Law Firm at Jason@gorilaw.com.) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 11/16 10:48 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (sent via email to counsel of record, Jason Epps, The Gori Law Firm at Jason@gorilaw.com.) (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 11/16 10:27 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-02781. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/15 9:16 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-180) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
6 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Jason B. Epps as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2781 (JRT/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-] lated Cases-Non-MDL
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9866174) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/16/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet