Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-10552

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:22-ap-01060
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
66 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
John J. Pinto
Represented By
John J. Pinto
contact info
Defendant
Tammy Laird
Represented By
Tammy Laird
contact info
Defendant
Arianna L. Black
Represented By
Arianna L. Black
contact info
Defendant
Office of the President Clear Recon Corp
Represented By
Office of the President Clear Recon Corp
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Treasurer Clear Recon Corp
Represented By
Office of the Treasurer Clear Recon Corp
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey T Garrity
Represented By
Jeffrey T Garrity
contact info
Defendant
Office of the President The Escrow Group, Inc.
Represented By
Office of the President The Escrow Group, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Office of Registered National Mortgage Loan Service FirstKey Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Office of Registered National Mortgage Loan Service FirstKey Mortgage, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Susan Marie Sinn
Represented By
Susan Marie Sinn
contact info
Defendant
Office of Managing Partner, Aldridge Pite, LLP
Represented By
Office of Managing Partner, Aldridge Pite, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Office of Manager Stox Posting and Publishing, LLC
Represented By
Office of Manager Stox Posting and Publishing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Office of the California Secretary of State
Represented By
Office of the California Secretary of State
contact info
Defendant
Spencer McMullen
Represented By
Spencer McMullen
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Chief Financial Officer, Quality Mortgage Group
Represented By
Office of the Chief Financial Officer, Quality Mortgage Group
contact info
Defendant
Ron Lloyd
Represented By
Ron Lloyd
contact info
Defendant
Office of the President Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Office of the President Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Steven W. Pite
Represented By
Steven W. Pite
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Chief Financial Officer New York Community Bank
Represented By
Office of the Chief Financial Officer New York Community Bank
contact info
Defendant
William Nunan
Represented By
William Nunan
contact info
Defendant
Office of Chief Accounting Officer NYCB Mortgage Company, LLC
Represented By
Office of Chief Accounting Officer NYCB Mortgage Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Beckmann
Represented By
William Beckmann
contact info
Defendant
Office of Chief Executive Office Merscrop Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Office of Chief Executive Office Merscrop Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Office of Chief Executive Office Merscorp, Inc.
Represented By
Office of Chief Executive Office Merscorp, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Chief Executive Office Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Chief Executive Office Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Commissioner Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Office of the Commissioner Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
contact info
Defendant
Joan Hartmann
Represented By
Joan Hartmann
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Chair County Board of Supervisors, Government of County of Santa Barbara
Represented By
Office of the Chair County Board of Supervisors, Government of County of Santa Barbara
contact info
Defendant
Joseph E. Holland
Represented By
Joseph E. Holland
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Clerk- Recorder County of Santa Barbara California
Represented By
Office of the Clerk- Recorder County of Santa Barbara California
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Bjork
Represented By
Rebecca Bjork
contact info
Defendant
Office of the City Administrator/Clerk/Treasurer City of Santa Barbara
Represented By
Office of the City Administrator/Clerk/Treasurer City of Santa Barbara
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1-30, Inclusive
Represented By
DOES 1-30, Inclusive
contact info
Defendant
Matthew M. Clarke
Represented By
Matthew M. Clarke
contact info
Defendant
United States Social Security Administration
Represented By
United States Social Security Administration
contact info
Defendant
Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By
Kilolo Kijakazi
contact info
Defendant
Office of the General Counsel "OGC" Region IX, Peter K. Thompson (Acting)
Represented By
Office of the General Counsel "OGC" Region IX, Peter K. Thompson (Acting)
contact info
Defendant
Office of Chief Executive Officer, Governor State of California
Represented By
Office of Chief Executive Officer, Governor State of California
contact info
Defendant
Office of the California Attorney General
Represented By
Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By
Robert Andres Bonta
contact info
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
Represented By
Gavin Newsom
contact info
Defendant
State of California, John Kenneth Reed Estate
Represented By
State of California, John Kenneth Reed Estate
contact info
Defendant
John K Reed
Represented By
John K Reed
contact info
Defendant
John Reed
Represented By
John Reed
contact info
Defendant
JK Reed
Represented By
JK Reed
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth F. Rojas
Represented By
Elizabeth F. Rojas
contact info
Defendant
Peter C. Anderson
Represented By
Peter C. Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Office of the United States Trustee, Region 16
Represented By
Office of the United States Trustee, Region 16
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee Northern Division Region 16
Represented By
Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee Northern Division Region 16
contact info
Defendant
Justin Crowley
Represented By
Justin Crowley
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Chief Financial Officer Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By
Office of the Chief Financial Officer Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Melissa A. Rosal
Represented By
Melissa A. Rosal
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Vice-President, U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By
Office of the Vice-President, U.S. Bank Trust National Association
contact info
Defendant
Katie Marcon
Represented By
Katie Marcon
contact info
Defendant
Office of Senior Vice President and Counsel, FirstKey Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Office of Senior Vice President and Counsel, FirstKey Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
David A. Essex
Represented By
David A. Essex
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Member and Chief Financial Officer, FirstKey Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Office of the Member and Chief Financial Officer, FirstKey Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Trustee's Vice-President U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By
Office of the Trustee's Vice-President U.S. Bank Trust National Association
contact info
Defendant
Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2021 PM-1
Represented By
Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2021 PM-1
contact info
Defendant
FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust
Represented By
FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Waddell
Represented By
Anthony Waddell
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Partner Kelley Clarke, PLLC
Represented By
Office of the Partner Kelley Clarke, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dugan P. Kelley
Represented By
Dugan P. Kelley
contact info
Plaintiff
John Kenneth Reed
315 Meigs Rd A-403
Santa Barbara, CA 93109
Represented By
John Kenneth Reed
contact info
Trustee
Elizabeth (ND) F Rojas (TR)
Valley Executive Center 15260 Ventura Blvd., Suite 710
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
7 7 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 01/11 4:27 PM
Hearing Vacated: Order dismissing ap case and barring debtor from refiling entered on 11/21/22 Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/23 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 21, 2022
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/21 9:40 AM
Adversary Case 9:22-ap-1060 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (BH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Kenneth Reed
4 4 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/21 9:39 AM
**COPY OF ORDER ENTERED IN MAIN BANKRUPTCY CASE (9:22-bk-10552-RC)** - AP CASE IS DISMISSED - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CASE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 1307(c) WITH A TWO-YEAR BAR TO REFILING PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) AND 349(a) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/21/2022. (BH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/16 10:19 AM
Certificate of Service re: Summons Filed by Related [+]. (ES9)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 11/16 10:06 AM
Summons Issued on Plaintiff, service to be made upon Defendants Peter C. Anderson Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; William Beckmann Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Rebecca Bjork Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Arianna L. Black Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Robert Andres Bonta Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Chief Executive Office Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Matthew M. Clarke Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Justin Crowley Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; DOES 1-30, Inclusive Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; David A. Essex Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Jeffrey T Garrity Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Joan Hartmann Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Joseph E. Holland Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Dugan P. Kelley Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Kilolo Kijakazi Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Tammy Laird Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Ron Lloyd Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Katie Marcon Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Spencer McMullen Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Gavin Newsom Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; William Nunan Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Chief Accounting Officer NYCB Mortgage Company, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Chief Executive Office Merscorp, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Chief Executive Office Merscrop Holdings, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Chief Executive Officer, Governor State of California Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Manager Stox Posting and Publishing, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Managing Partner, Aldridge Pite, LLP Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Registered National Mortgage Loan Service FirstKey Mortgage, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of Senior Vice President and Counsel, FirstKey Holdings, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the California Attorney General Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the California Secretary of State Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Chair County Board of Supervisors, Government of County of Santa Barbara Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee Northern Division Region 16 Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Chief Financial Officer New York Community Bank Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Chief Financial Officer Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Chief Financial Officer, Quality Mortgage Group Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the City Administrator/Clerk/Treasurer City of Santa Barbara Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Clerk- Recorder County of Santa Barbara California Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Commissioner Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the General Counsel "OGC" Region IX, Peter K. Thompson (Acting) Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Member and Chief Financial Officer, FirstKey Holdings, LLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Partner Kelley Clarke, PLLC Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the President Clear Recon Corp Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the President Fidelity National Title Insurance Company Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the President The Escrow Group, Inc. Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Treasurer Clear Recon Corp Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Trustee's Vice-President U.S. Bank Trust National Association Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the United States Trustee, Region 16 Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Office of the Vice-President, U.S. Bank Trust National Association Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; John J. Pinto Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Steven W. Pite Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; JK Reed Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; John Reed Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; John K Reed Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; John K Reed Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Elizabeth F. Rojas Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Melissa A. Rosal Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Susan Marie Sinn Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; State of California, John Kenneth Reed Estate Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2021 PM-1 Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; United States Social Security Administration Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; United States Trustee (ND) Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022; Anthony Waddell Date Issued 11/16/2022, Answer Due 12/16/2022 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/11/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ronald A Clifford, III (ES9)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Kenneth Reed
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/16 9:50 AM
Adversary case 9:22-ap-01060. Complaint by John Kenneth Reed against United States Social Security Administration , Kilolo Kijakazi , Office of the General Counsel "OGC" Region IX, Peter K. Thompson (Acting) , Office of Chief Executive Officer, Governor State of California , Office of the California Attorney General , Robert Andres Bonta , Gavin Newsom , State of California, John Kenneth Reed Estate , John K Reed , John K Reed , John Reed , JK Reed , Elizabeth F. Rojas , Peter C. Anderson , Office of the United States Trustee, Region 16 , Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee Northern Division Region 16 , Justin Crowley , Office of the Chief Financial Officer Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. , Melissa A. Rosal , Office of the Vice-President, U.S. Bank Trust National Association , Katie Marcon , Office of Senior Vice President and Counsel, FirstKey Holdings, LLC , David A. Essex , Office of the Member and Chief Financial Officer, FirstKey Holdings, LLC , Office of the Trustee's Vice-President U.S. Bank Trust National Association , Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2021 PM-1 , FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust , Anthony Waddell , Office of the Partner Kelley Clarke, PLLC , Dugan P. Kelley , Matthew M. Clarke , Steven W. Pite , Tammy Laird , Arianna L. Black , Office of the President Clear Recon Corp , Office of the Treasurer Clear Recon Corp , Jeffrey T Garrity , Office of the President The Escrow Group, Inc. , Office of Registered National Mortgage Loan Service FirstKey Mortgage, LLC , Susan Marie Sinn , Office of Managing Partner, Aldridge Pite, LLP , Office of Manager Stox Posting and Publishing, LLC , Office of the California Secretary of State , Spencer McMullen , Office of the Chief Financial Officer, Quality Mortgage Group , Ron Lloyd , Office of the President Fidelity National Title Insurance Company , John J. Pinto , Office of the Chief Financial Officer New York Community Bank , William Nunan , Office of Chief Accounting Officer NYCB Mortgage Company, LLC , William Beckmann , Office of Chief Executive Office Merscrop Holdings, Inc. , Office of Chief Executive Office Merscorp, Inc. , Chief Executive Office Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. , Office of the Commissioner Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service , Joan Hartmann , Office of the Chair County Board of Supervisors, Government of County of Santa Barbara , Joseph E. Holland , Office of the Clerk- Recorder County of Santa Barbara California , Rebecca Bjork , Office of the City Administrator/Clerk/Treasurer City of Santa Barbara , DOES 1-30, Inclusive . ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims)) ,(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(72 (Injunctive relief - other))(ES9)
Related: [-]