New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:22-cv-06644
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, BER-L-17-00022
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 5:22 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
GREGORY VOLYNSKY
Represented By
JOSHUA MATTHEW LURIE
Lurie | Strupinsky, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
BERGEN COUNTY DEBATE CLUB, LLC
Represented By
ALEXANDER N. SCHACHTEL
Law Office Of Alexander Schachtel, LLC
contact info
Defendant
GREGORY VOLYNSKY
Represented By
JOSHUA MATTHEW LURIE
Lurie | Strupinsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BERGEN COUNTY DEBATE CLUB, LLC
Represented By
ALEXANDER N. SCHACHTEL
Law Office Of Alexander Schachtel, LLC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
BUSINESS ENTITIES A-Z
Third Party Defendant
JOHN H CHOI
Third Party Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Third Party Defendant
JOHN H. CHOI & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Third Party Defendant
OKSANA SAVRANSKY
Third Party Defendant
VLAD SAVRANSKY,
Third Party Plaintiff
GREGORY VOLYNSKY
Represented By
JOSHUA MATTHEW LURIE
Lurie | Strupinsky, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 16, 2023
11 11 order Order Thu 02/16 5:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs request made in D.E.9 is denied. Plaintiff is directed to L.Civ.R. 54.1. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 2/16/2023. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
10 10 respoth Reply to Response (NOT Motion) Thu 02/09 4:26 PM
REPLY to Response re9 Response (NOT Motion). (LURIE, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
9 9 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Wed 02/01 11:12 AM
RESPONSE re7 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
8 8 misc Letter: Remand Tue 01/31 2:45 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Bergen County Justice Center 10 Main Street Hackensack, NJ 07601 State No: BER-L-005617-22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jd, )
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 01/31 2:40 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/31/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/31 2:50 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
6 6 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 01/24 8:43 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/24/2023. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/23 11:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against VLAD SAVRANSKY,, BUSINESS ENTITIES A-Z, JOHN H CHOI, JOHN DOES 1-10, OKSANA SAVRANSKY, JOHN H. CHOI & ASSOCIATES, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against BERGEN COUNTY DEBATE CLUB, LLC by GREGORY VOLYNSKY.(LURIE, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Draft Complaint with Exhibits
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
4 4 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/20 2:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by GREGORY VOLYNSKY re3 First MOTION to Remand (LURIE, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/02 11:44 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 First MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 1/3/2023 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
3 3 motion Remand to State Court Thu 12/01 2:43 PM
First MOTION to Remand by BERGEN COUNTY DEBATE CLUB, LLC.(SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Plainitff,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Order,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service Cert Service
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/02 10:31 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
2 2 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 11/17 4:28 PM
Exhibit to1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by GREGORY VOLYNSKY. (LURIE, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 11/17 11:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Disclosure Statement, andParty Information . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jd, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Thu 11/17 11:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/16 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CARNEGIE DEBATE LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, LAW DIVISION, case number BER-L-5617-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13834710), filed by CARNEGIE DEBATE LLC.(LURIE, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/16 5:05 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
Related: [-]