New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:22-cv-06645
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Dec 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
STEVEN M QUADREL
Plaintiff
CHRIS QUADREL
Represented By
ARLA D. CAHILL
Mandelbaum Barrett P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN QUADREL
Represented By
ARLA D. CAHILL
Mandelbaum Barrett P.C.
contact info

GPO Dec 01 2023
WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (wh)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 12/01 4:01 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's9 Motion for Default Judgment. New Jersey's Slayer Statute shall govern the disposition and disbursement of the Equitable Variable Life Insurance Policy. Defendant is not entitled to any distribution under the Policy. Equitable is authorized to disburse to Plaintiffs, in equal shares, Defendant's share of the Policy's insurance benefit. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (wh)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Opinion Fri 12/01 3:54 PM
WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/1/2023. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/28 6:43 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Steven M Quadrel . Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/22 4:51 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Steven M Quadrel by All Plaintiffs.(CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Arla D Cahill Esq,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 18, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/18 4:32 PM
ORDER directing plaintiffs to file motion for default judgment by 9/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/18/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Tue 06/27 3:53 PM
Letter from Arla D. Cahill. (CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
6 6 order Order Mon 05/08 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference shall be held on May 31, 2023 at 4:00 p.m. before the undersigned. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/8/23. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
5 5 misc Request for Default Fri 02/17 4:32 PM
Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Defendant Steven M. Quadrel.(CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Arla D. Cahill, Esq.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Service
order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 02/17 4:42 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Steven Quadrel for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Wed 01/25 4:52 PM
Letter to the Court from Steven Quadrel. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 01/24 5:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, CIS served on Defendant Steven M. Quadrel on January 11, 2023, filed by CHRIS QUADREL, RYAN QUADREL. (CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/22 9:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEVEN M QUADREL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/16 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against STEVEN M QUADREL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13834712), filed by RYAN QUADREL, CHRIS QUADREL.(CAHILL, ARLA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/22 8:19 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
Related: [-]