Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:22-cv-62138
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 4:59 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Britt's Bow Wow Boutique, Inc
Represented By
Laurie Amber Perez
Howard And Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Merri Colvard
Represented By
Laurie Amber Perez
Howard And Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sydney Marie Keefe
Represented By
Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
contact info
Defendant
Merri Colvard
Represented By
Laurie Amber Perez
Howard And Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Michael F. Wais
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Britt's Bow Wow Boutique, Inc
Represented By
Laurie Amber Perez
Howard And Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Michael F. Wais
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Daniel T Feld
Plaintiff
Sydney Marie Keefe
Represented By
Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
contact info

GPO Aug 22 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Defendants' Motion for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 8/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
GPO Sep 18 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Defendants' Amended Motion in Limine and denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 9/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
GPO Nov 06 2023
ORDER denying 113 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch on 11/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
GPO Mar 11 2024
Report and Recommendation on 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs and 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by March 25, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 3/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
GPO Mar 26 2024
ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; OVERRULING OBJECTIONS; GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COSTS; GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Attorney Fees; Approving 163 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
173 173 appeal Transcript Order Form - Attorney (PART I) Thu 08/22 8:10 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Sydney Marie Keefe re147 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Merri Colvard, Britt's Bow Wow Boutique, Inc. No Transcript Requested. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
172 172 appeal Transcript Order Form - Attorney (PART I) Thu 08/22 8:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Sydney Marie Keefe re166 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Merri Colvard, Britt's Bow Wow Boutique, Inc. No Transcript Requested. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]