New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:22-cv-06648
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Burlington County, BUR L 001927 22
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC
Represented By
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
SHIKHA DUTTA
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
ANNA DANIELLE NORMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Defendant
RELIEVUS
Represented By
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
SHIKHA DUTTA
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
ANNA DANIELLE NORMAN
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY CAPONE
Represented By
DANIEL T. SILVERMAN
Costello & Mains PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/09 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record on April 2, 2025, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 34) is GRANTED. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 4/9/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
43 43 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/02 2:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2025 re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No.34 , is GRANTED, for the reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter, Meta Goddard (856-576-7063)) (dmr)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/02 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Christine P. O'Hearn for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/2/2025. (mmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
41 41 order Order Thu 03/13 2:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold oral argument on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 34, on April 2, 2025 at 10:00am, Courtroom 5A, before Judge Christine P. O'Hearn. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 3/13/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 02/19 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Settlement Conference held on 2/19/2025. Case not settled. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
40 40 order Order Fri 02/07 9:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court finding that a settlement conference would conserve judicial resources and serve the best interest of the parties and the Court; it is hereby ORDERED that an in-person settlement conference is scheduled for February 19, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. All counsel shall report to the Mitchell H. Cohen Building & U.S. Courthouse, 4th & Cooper Streets, Courtroom 3B, Camden, NJ 08101. Counsel are advised that the Court requires the client(s) and an agent or person with full settlement authority to attend the conference. Prior to the conference, all parties shall have exchanged initial demands and/or settlement offers. All parties shall follow the Judge's preferences for submitting settlement memoranda. Each party shall submit a settlement memorandum to the Court by email at least three (3) business days before the scheduled conference. The memorandum shall not exceed five (5) pages, including exhibits. If additional exhibits are desired, the parties may offer them during the conference. Email memoranda to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/7/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
39 39 order Order Mon 08/12 10:33 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the August 7, 2024 letter [ECF No. 38] filed by Daniel T. Silverman, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiff; and the Court noting that the pre-motion status conference set for August 21, 2024 was entered in error and deleted; it is hereby ORDERED that the August 21, 2024 pre-motion conference is CANCELED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/12/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
38 38 misc Letter Wed 08/07 10:18 AM
Letter from Plaintiff regarding Pre-Motion Conference. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
37 37 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 04/29 5:19 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DUTTA, SHIKHA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Certification of James J. Panzini with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit 17 through 21,
Att: 4 Compendium of Unpublished Cases,
Att: 5 Attachment to Compendium of Unpublished Cases,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
36 36 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/17 1:05 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ANTHONY CAPONE re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification with Exhibits
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/02 3:33 PM
Reset Deadlines as to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
35 35 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Mon 04/01 10:36 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/22 10:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
34 34 motion Summary Judgment Thu 03/21 5:19 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS.Compendium of Unpublished Cases, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(DUTTA, SHIKHA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Statement,
Att: 3 Declaration of James J. Panzini, Esq.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 through 16,
Att: 5 Declaration Andrew Thompson,
Att: 6 Exhibit A through L,
Att: 7 8
Monday, March 11, 2024
33 33 order Order Mon 03/11 1:56 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on March 11, 2024, and the Defendants representing that they contemplate filing a dispositive motion by the March 21, 2024 deadline; if necessary, the Court will schedule a future conference once the contemplated motion is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/11/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 03/11 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/11/2024. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/10 2:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, the joint oral application on January 10, 2024 for an extension of time to complete discovery shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. An Amended Scheduling Order shall issue. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/10/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/10 2:09 PM
Joint Oral Application on January 10, 2024 for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (mb, )
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Status Conference Wed 01/10 2:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/10/2024. (mb, )
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order Wed 01/10 12:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on January 10, 2024; it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for completing fact discovery is extended to February 2, 2024; and it is further ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to March 21, 2024. A follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for March 11, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 533 402 919#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/10/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
28 28 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/30 4:44 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial Factual Discovery extended to 1/17/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/30/2023. (mag)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 10/30 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/30/2023. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
27 27 order Order Wed 10/18 1:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having scheduled a telephone status conference on October 18, 2023; and counsel for Defendant having failed to appear for the conference; it is hereby ORDERED that another telephone status conference is scheduled for October 30, 2023 at 2:00 pm . Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 307 146 82# . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 10/18/23. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
26 26 order Order Thu 08/17 4:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on August 17, 2023; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for October 18, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 2961061# . The deadlines set forth in the July 25, 2023 Amended Scheduling Order [ECF No. 25] remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/17/23. (lc-asm, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 08/17 2:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/17/2023. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
25 25 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/25 10:37 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial factual Discovery extended to 11/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/25/2023. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
24 24 misc Letter Fri 07/21 2:06 PM
Letter from Shikha Dutta Requesting an extension of the foregoing Discovery end date for 90 days. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/31 4:04 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial factual Discovery extended to 8/18/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/31/2023. (amv)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/31 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, the joint oral application on May 31, 2023 for an extension of time to complete discovery shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. Amended scheduling order shall issue. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/31/23. (mb, )
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/31 3:11 PM
Joint Oral Application on May 31, 2023 for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 05/31 3:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/31/2023. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
20 20 order Order Thu 05/25 10:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the May 24, 2023 letter submitted by Shikha Dutta, Esquire [ECF No. 19], counsel for Defendants; it is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for May 31, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. is CONVERTED to a telephone status conference on the same date and time. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 2961061#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/25/23. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
19 19 misc Letter Wed 05/24 2:53 PM
Letter from Shikha Dutta requesting adjournment for settlement conference. (DUTTA, SHIKHA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
18 18 order Order Thu 04/06 9:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the April 4, 2023 letter [ECF No. 17] submitted by Daniel T. Silverman, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiff; it is hereby ORDERED that the in-person settlement conference scheduled for April 24, 2023 is RESCHEDULED to May 31, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. All counsel shall report to the Mitchell H. Cohen Building & U.S. Courthouse, 4th & Cooper Streets, Courtroom 5C, Camden, NJ 08101. Counsel shall follow the procedures and directives previously set forth in the April 3, 2023 Text Order [ECF No. 16]. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/6/23. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Tue 04/04 11:28 AM
Letter from Plaintiff with adjournment request re 16 Order,,,,,,. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
16 16 order Order Mon 04/03 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on April 3, 2023, and the Court finding that a settlement conference is warranted; it is hereby ORDERED that an in-person settlement conference is scheduled for April 24, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. All counsel shall report to the Mitchell H. Cohen Building & U.S. Courthouse, 4th & Cooper Streets, Courtroom 5C, Camden, NJ 08101. Counsel are advised that the Court requires the client(s) and an agent or person with full settlement authority to attend the conference. Moreover, prior to the conference, all parties shall have exchanged initial demands and/or settlement offers. All parties shall follow the Judge's preferences for submitting settlement memoranda. Each party shall submit a settlement memorandum to the Court by email at least three (3) business days before the scheduled conference. The memorandum shall not exceed five (5) pages, including exhibits. If additional exhibits are desired, the parties may offer them during the conference. Email memoranda to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that all in-person conferences shall be conducted in compliance with the Court's COVID-19: Orders, Procedures & Changes. For the most up-to-date information, the parties are advised to (1) visit the District of New Jersey website at www.njd.uscourts.gov, (2) select the "Court Information" tab, and then (3) "COVID-19: ORDERS, PROCEDURES AND CHANGES" at the bottom of the dropdown menu. The direct link to this page is www.njd.uscourts.gov/covid-19-orders-procedures-and-changes. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/3/23. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 04/03 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/3/2023. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/31 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHIKHA DUTTA on behalf of ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS (DUTTA, SHIKHA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Thu 01/12 11:19 AM
Letter from Plaintiff re e-discovery conf re13 Scheduling Order,. (SILVERMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/04 8:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/3/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2023. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 7/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2023; If no expert discovery will be served, due by 8/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/3/2023. (amv)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/03 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/3/2023 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
12 12 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 12/23 1:32 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS.(NORMAN, ANNA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
11 11 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Fri 12/16 3:33 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 12/14 2:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC. (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Wed 12/14 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on January 3, 2023 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/14/22. (mb, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Filed in Incorrect Case Wed 12/14 3:12 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement10 filed by MICHAEL HOLZAPFEL on 12/14/22 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REVIEW THE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and file it in the correct case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
8 8 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 12/12 2:11 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 1/3/2023 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/12/2022. (amv)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/12 11:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC.(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Thu 12/01 3:42 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's time to and including December 16, 2022, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/1/2022. (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/30 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA DANIELLE NORMAN on behalf of ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS (NORMAN, ANNA)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 11/30 11:05 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS. (NORMAN, ANNA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/18 12:03 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jurisdiction,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 11/18 12:09 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document3 submitted by RELIEVUS, ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC on 11/16/2022 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/30/2022. (jab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 11/16 5:53 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 11/16 5:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC, RELIEVUS. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/16 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RELIEVUS, ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC from Superior Court of Burlington County, case number BUR L 001927 22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13835108), filed by RELIEVUS, ADVANCED SPINE AND PAIN, LLC.(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Compliance,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/17 3:10 PM
Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
Related: [-]