Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:22-cv-01215
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2023 6:09 AM CDT
Defendant
L. Miguel Arce
Represented By
Michael William O'Donnell
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
James Ivan Hughes
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Mario Alberto Barrera
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Internacional Realty Management, LLC
Represented By
Michael William O'Donnell
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
James Ivan Hughes
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Mario Alberto Barrera
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Dillard
Represented By
Adam Walton
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Kristen Elizabeth Hudson
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Andrew Joseph Alvarado
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
John Robert Nelson
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2023
ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING 32 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm)
GPO Nov 14 2023
ORDER DENYING 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm)
GPO Jan 05 2024
ORDER DENYING 60 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 15, 2024
74 74 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/15 3:07 PM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
73 73 notice Notice Fri 04/12 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice by L. Miguel Arce, Internacional Realty Management, LLC(O'Donnell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/10 8:55 AM
Text Order GRANTING72 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Dkt. # 72.) The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before April 12, 2024. If the parties are unable to submit those documents by that date, parties should move for an extension of time to file the documents. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
72 72 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 04/09 5:02 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal or Agreed Judgment by Sarah Dillard.(Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order