Oregon District Court
Judge:Marco A Hernandez
Case #: 3:22-cv-01800
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332cl Class Action Fairness Action - 2005
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2022
Re-opened:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2023 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Fred Meyer Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Jessica D. Osborne
Bullard Law
contact info
Edward Choi
Bullard Law
contact info
Dennis E. Westlind
Bullard Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Urvina
803 W 11th Street, Apt. 4
Medford, OR 97501
Represented By
Richard B. Myers
Bennett Hartman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Woody
1290 Santa Fe Rd, Apt 302
Romeoville, IL 60446
Represented By
Richard B. Myers
Bennett Hartman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
April Allen
2221 Marine Dr NW, Apt 368
Salem, OR 97301
Represented By
Richard B. Myers
Bennett Hartman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Delia Cruz
5971 N. Fessenden Street
Portland, OR 97203
Represented By
Richard B. Myers
Bennett Hartman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Candice Trent
4423 SE Stark Street
Portland, OR 97215
Represented By
Richard B. Myers
Bennett Hartman, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 24 2024
OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 18 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs may submit a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, attaching a proposed Second Amended Complaint, within 14 days. Signed on 1/24/2024 by District Judge Marco A Hernandez. (jp)
GPO Oct 17 2024
OPINION & ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Settlement, ECF 49, without prejudice and with leave to renew to cure the deficiencies set out in this Opinion and Order. Signed on 10/17/2024 by Judge Marco A Hernandez. (jp)
GPO Feb 03 2025
Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Unopposed Renewed Motion for Preliminary Settlement, ECF 54, and directs Plaintiffs to submit a form of Order conforming with this Opinion and Order. The Court will set a final fairness hearing and briefing schedule after the Court enters the Order approving the preliminary settlement. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 2/3/2025 by Judge Marco A Hernandez. (ecp)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
66 66 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 02/26 12:13 PM
Scheduling Order. Fairness hearing set for 6/13/2025 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A Hernandez. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
65 65 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 10:45 AM
ORDER: GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT . Signed on 2/25/2025 by Judge Marco A Hernandez. (ecp)
Related: [-]