Webb, et al v. Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC
Original Case: 1:22-cv-10797
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-civil-01896 |
Type | civil / private / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2023 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
INJURED WORKERS PHARMACY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALEXSIS WEBB, on behalf of herself and all others similarily situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARSCLETTE CHARLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarily situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALEXSIS WEBB, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARSCLETTE CHARLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 30 2023
OPINION issued by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and Lara E. Montecalvo, Appellate Judge. Published. [22-1896] |
Docket last updated: 07/03/2023 4:36 AM EDT |
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #26) filed by Appellants Marsclette Charley and Alexsis Webb. Docketing Statement due 12/01/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 12/01/2022. Appearance form due 12/01/2022. 22-1896 . (CMP) | ||
Att: 1 14 pgs Abbreviated District Court Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |