Peninsula Pathology Associates
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arenda L Wright Allen |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:22-mc-00001 |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER of USCA as to30 Notice of Appeal filed by American International Industries. Case placed in abeyance pending decision in 20-cv-5589 from United States District Court Southern District of New York. 23-1972 (jhie, ) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() USCA Case Number 23-1972 4CCA Case Manager T. Barton for30 Notice of Appeal, filed by American International Industries. (jhie, ) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re30 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov)(jhie, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to24 Order on Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation,11 Order on Motion to Quash, by American International Industries. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AVAEDC-9123189. (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
29 | 29
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re26 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by American International Industries. (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Memorandum in Support to27 Objection filed by American International Industries. (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Objection to25 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by American International Industries. (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER: This court GRANTS Peninsula's motion for attorney's fees, (ECF No. 12), and awards Peninsula such fees and costs of $44,610.45. This order will fully resolve the case unless either party objects within 14 days under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a). Copies sent on 8.16.23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 8/16/23. (epri, ) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER. American International Industries' Objections (ECF No.17 ) are OVERRULED, and the Magistrate Judge's Order (ECF No.11 ) granting the Motion to Quash is AFFIRMED. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/14/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Response to22 NOTICE filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates. (Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE by American International Industries(Hatch, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Reply to17 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation re11 Order on Motion to Quash, filed by American International Industries.(Hatch, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Memorandum in Opposition re17 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation re11 Order on Motion to Quash, filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by American International Industries. (Thackston, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Memorandum in Support re17 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation re11 Order on Motion to Quash, filed by American International Industries.(Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation re11 Order on Motion to Quash, by American International Industries. (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia Macon Kastens on behalf of American International Industries (Kastens, Sylvia) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lucas Hatch on behalf of American International Industries (Hatch, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections. Respondent American International Industries shall file its Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order on or before January 11, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 1/6/23. (jhie, ) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 01/06 8:57 AM
MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller.13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 Order on Motion to Quash, (jhie, ) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 Order on Motion to Quash, by American International Industries.(Thackston, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Attorney Fees by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Friday, December 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER re1 Motion to Quash. The Court GRANTS Peninsula's motion to quash and ORDERS Peninsula to file a sworn statement of its costs and fees by January 4, 2023, and ORDERS responses to be filed by January 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/23/2022. (dbra, ) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Video Conference proceedings held on 12/16/2022, before Judge Douglas E. Miller, Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/23/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2023.(mcmanus, paul) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2022 re1 MOTION to Quash filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates. Matter came on for hearing on Motion to Quash (#1). Present via zoom were Elizabeth Lockwood and Kathryn Ali on behalf of the petitioner and Eric Cook and Robert Thackston on behalf of the respondent. Mr. Thackston explained the intentions of the motion to quash. Response by Ms. Ali. Argument presented by both parties. For the reasons stated on the record the Court GRANTED the motion to quash. Petitioners have also requested sanctions. The Court heard argument regarding that request. The Court took the request for sanctions under advisement. Petitioners counsel directed to submit a sworn affidavit regarding costs and fees by January 4 And respondents may file a response by January 18. The Court will then issue an order on that matter. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(cdod, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Remote Hearings ( CV Magistrate)
Tue 12/13 3:44 PM
Set Remote Hearing (CV Magistrate)Members of the public wishing to listen to remote proceedings should call the Norfolk Division at 757-222-7222 before the hearing for instructions on how to listen to the proceedings. Recording of court proceedings of any kind is prohibited. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2022 at 02:30 PM on Motion to Quash (#1) in Norfolk Remote w/OCR before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, ) |
||
Thursday, December 08, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re1 MOTION to Quash filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Thackston on behalf of American International Industries (Thackston, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 12/05 12:11 PM
ORDER granting3 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth C. Lockwood as certified by local counsel Kathryn M. Ali for Petitioner Pennsylvania Pathology Associates. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/05/2022. (Allen, Arenda) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by American International Industries. (Cook, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Opposition to1 MOTION to Quash filed by American International Industries.(Cook, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth C. Lockwood and Certification of Local Counsel Kathryn M. Ali Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8679206. by Peninsula Pathology Associates. (Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Memorandum in Support re1 MOTION to Quash filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION TO QUASH (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AVAEDC-8667030.), filed by Peninsula Pathology Associates.(Ali, Kathryn) Modified on 11/18/2022 (epri, ) |
|
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 11/18 11:42 AM
Notice of Correction re1 MOTION to Quash. Document number1 contains a Brief in Support attached to the Motion which we have removed. The Motion to Quash and the Brief in Support must be filed as separate docket entries. Please refile the Brief in Support as a separate docket entry using its respective event. (epri, ) |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/18 11:55 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |