California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:22-mc-80313
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jun 09, 2023 8:29 AM PDT
Petitioner
Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited
Represented By
Weizhi Stella Mao
Morrison Foerster LLP
contact info
Bryan Joseph Wilson
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Alan Max Olson
contact info
Respondent
Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By
Philip J. Wang
Putterman | Yu LLP
contact info
Traci Michelle Keith
Putterman Yu
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2023
ORDER Granting 17 Petition to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
40 40 utility Remark Wed 06/14 3:47 PM
Remark: Fujitsu's Petition to Compel Arbitration was granted at Dkt. No.37 . The Clerk is directed to close the case. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/14/2023 (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
39 39 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 06/13 12:01 PM
Declaration of A. Max Olson in Support of38 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed,,, Corrected Redaction Pursuant to Order, original Declaration at Dkt 18 filed byFujitsu Semiconductor Limited. Related [+] (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-] 38
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Tue 06/06 12:33 PM
ORDER re 18 19 24 25 28 Sealing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
37 37 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 06/05 5:47 PM
ORDER Granting 17 Petition to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
36 36 misc Transcript Thu 04/20 11:52 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/11/23, before Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia DeMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:44 - 11:40. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2023. (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-] 33 Transcript Order, (s)33
Monday, April 17, 2023
35 35 misc Transcript Order Mon 04/17 1:27 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Wang, Philip) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 4/17/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
34 34 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 04/14 10:14 AM
Request for Judicial Notice re17 Amended MOTION to Compel Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Article II of the New York Convention and Section 206 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. § 206 ,29 Reply to Opposition/Response, NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed byFujitsu Semiconductor Limited. Related [+] (Mao, Weizhi)
Related: [-] 17 ,29
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
33 33 misc Transcript Order Wed 04/12 3:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/11/2023 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Mao, Weizhi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
32 32 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/11 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion Hearing re1 Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration against Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited held on 4/11/2023. The Court heard oral argument and the Court to issue a written order. Petitioner's Attorney: Weizhi Mao, Bryan Wilson. Respondent's Attorney: Phillip Wang. No Court reporter. Digital Recording Liberty:10:44-11:40a.m. Total time: 56 Minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2023)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
31 31 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 04/03 8:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited and AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, February 27, 2023
30 30 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 02/27 11:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited re28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Petitioner's Reply ISO Its Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Supporting Materials (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 02/27 11:06 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byFujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-] 17 Amended MOTION to Compel Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Article II of the New York Convention and Section 206 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. § 206
Att: 1 Reply Declaration of A. Max Olson (Redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit L (Redacted),
Att: 3 Exhibit M,
Att: 4 Exhibit N,
Att: 5 Exhibit O
28 28 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 02/27 11:00 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Petitioner's Reply ISO Its Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Supporting Materials filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Weizhi Stella Mao,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Petitioner's Reply ISO Its Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Reply Declaration of A. Max Olson,
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L to the Reply Declaration of A. Max Olson
Saturday, February 25, 2023
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Sat 02/25 1:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. The hearing as to Dkt. No.17 is continued to 4/11/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
26 26 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 02/21 3:27 PM
Declaration of Weizhi Stella Mao in Support of25 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byFujitsu Semiconductor Limited. Related [+] (Mao, Weizhi)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 13, 2023
25 25 motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Mon 02/13 9:02 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Opposition Brief (To Be Sealed)
24 24 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 02/13 8:59 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Philip J. Wang,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Opposition Brief (To Be Sealed),
Att: 4 Declaration (To Be Sealed)
23 23 30+ pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 02/13 8:55 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byCypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Wang, Philip)
Related: [-] 17 Amended MOTION to Compel Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Article II of the New York Convention and Section 206 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. § 206
Att: 1 Declaration Philip J. Wang,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, January 19, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/19 5:42 PM
ORDER re Stipulated Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/19/2023. Respondent's Response due 2/13/2023. Petitioner's Reply due 2/27/2023. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 01/18 8:27 PM
STIPULATION re17 Amended MOTION to Compel Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Article II of the New York Convention and Section 206 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. § 206 STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINES REGARDING AMENDED PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELING ARBITRATION filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
20 20 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 01/13 10:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited re19 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed ,18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Petitioner Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited's Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Supporting Materials (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Fri 01/13 10:30 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 UNREDACTED Version of Petition to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 UNREDACTED Version of Declaration of A. Max Olson,
Att: 4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibt A to Olson Declaration,
Att: 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B to Olson Declaration,
Att: 6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit G to Olson Declaration,
Att: 7 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit K to Olson Declaration
18 18 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 01/13 10:24 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Petitioner Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited's Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Supporting Materials filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Weizhi Stella Mao,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 UNREDACTED Version of Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 UNREDACTED Version of A. Max Olson Declaration,
Att: 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit E to Olson Declaration,
Att: 6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit F to Olson Declaration,
Att: 7 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit H to Olson Declaration,
Att: 8 UNREDACTED version of Exhibit I to Olson Declaration,
Att: 9 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit K to Olson Declaration
17 17 motion Compel Fri 01/13 10:13 PM
Amended MOTION to Compel Amended Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration Pursuant to Article II of the New York Convention and Section 206 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. § 206 filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 1/30/2023. Replies due by 2/6/2023.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of A. Max Olson,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Olson Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Olson Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit G to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 9 Exhibit H to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 10 Exhibit I to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 11 Exhibit J to Olson Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit K to Olson Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 13 Declaration of Takahiro Nonaka,
Att: 14 Exhibit A to Nonaka Declaration,
Att: 15 Exhibit B to Nonaka Declaration,
Att: 16 Proposed Order
oth_evt ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/13 4:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING: Hearing as to1 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is set for 3/7/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 01/03 3:03 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.. (Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 12/20 8:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Infineon Technologies AG for Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 12/20 8:06 PM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Petition filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/20 8:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Traci Michelle Keith (Keith, Traci)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/20 7:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Wang (Wang, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation served on 12/8/2022, answer due 12/29/2022. (Wilson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/05 5:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.. (Wilson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/21 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Weizhi Stella Mao (Mao, Weizhi)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/21 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Joseph Wilson (Wilson, Bryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 11/21 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 11/21 9:02 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 11/18 9:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited for Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited. (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 11/18 9:31 PM
Proposed Summons. (Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 11/18 9:28 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Material filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Unredacted Version of Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Declaration of A. Max Olson,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. A,
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. E,
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. I
2 2 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 11/18 9:21 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fujitsu's Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration and Supporting Materials filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Weizzhi Stella Mao,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of A. Max Olson,
Att: 5 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. D,
Att: 6 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. F,
Att: 7 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. G,
Att: 8 Unredacted Version of Olson Ex. I
1 1 24 pgs cmp Petition (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Fri 11/18 9:08 PM
PETITION for Order Compelling Arbitration against Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number BCANDC-17743800.). Filed by Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited.(Olson, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Max Olson (public version),
Att: 2 Olson Ex. A (public version),
Att: 3 Olson Ex. B,
Att: 4 Olson Ex. C,
Att: 5 Olson Ex. D (public version),
Att: 6 1 pgs Olson Ex. E (public version),
Att: 7 1 pgs Olson Ex. F (public version),
Att: 8 1 pgs Olson Ex. G (public version),
Att: 9 Olson Ex. H,
Att: 10 Olson Ex. I (public version),
Att: 11 Declaration of Takahiro Nonaka,
Att: 12 Nonaka Ex. A,
Att: 13 Nonaka Ex. B,
Att: 14 Proposed Order,
Att: 15 Civil Cover Sheet