California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:22-cv-08467
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 6:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Allocated Liquor LLC
Plaintiff
Sazerac Brands, LLC
Represented By
Cynthia Johnson Walden
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Megan Alexandra Chacon
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Meredith M. Bayer
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Christopher R. Dillon
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
43 43 3 pgs misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Wed 07/05 1:44 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
42 42 2 pgs judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Wed 07/05 1:42 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment41 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: 1. JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant, in accordance with this Courts Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment; 2. The Court AWARDS Plaintiff damages in the amount of $30,000.00; and 3. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc) .
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
41 41 12 pgs order Default Judgment Mon 07/03 2:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT36 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS Sazerac's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Allocated for trademark infringement, counterfeiting, false designation of origin, and unfair competition. The Court AWARDS Sazerac $30,000.00 total in statutory damages. The Court DENIES Sazerac's request for a permanent injunction and attorneys' fees. The Court will issue Judgment consistent with this order. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
40 40 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 02/14 9:29 AM
The hearing on the MOTION for Default Judgment36 , scheduled for February 27, 2023 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
39 39 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 02/03 3:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC36 , Miscellaneous Document38 served on 02/02/2023. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
38 38 2 pgs misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 01/23 8:10 PM
Certificate of Compliance filed by Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC36 (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 01/23 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff moves for Default Judgment36 , but does not include the requisite certificate of compliance with Local Rule 11-6. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Local Rule 11-6 certificate of compliance within three court days of the date of this order. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file an amended motion that complies with Local Rule 11-6 within three court days. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in the Court striking the noncompliant filing. (lc) Modified on 1/23/2023 (lc).
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
36 36 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/20 8:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Cynthia J. Walden,
Att: 3 4 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, January 12, 2023
35 35 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 01/12 4:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC, served on 01/03/2023. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
34 34 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 12/22 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of Service (subsequent documents). Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
33 33 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 12/21 1:36 PM
Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC30 (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
32 32 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/20 3:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than January 20, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's filing of a noticed motion for entry of default judgment for the defendant. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 12/20 10:01 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Allocated Liquor LLC (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
30 30 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 12/19 1:48 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Megan A. Chacon,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A
Friday, December 16, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/16 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than December 19, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant.Answer by the defendant(s). In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia Johnson Walden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC and designating Megan A. Chacon as local counsel25 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 2:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Dillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC and designating Megan A. Chacon as local counsel24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/08 2:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC designating Megan A. Chacon as local counsel23 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
25 25 4 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 12/07 8:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia Johnson Walden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/28/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34383129) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 12/07 8:51 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Dillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374454) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 12/07 8:49 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374782) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
22 22 attorney Change of Address Tue 11/29 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Megan Alexandra Chacon attorney for Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 633 West Fifth Street, 26th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Tue 11/29 10:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374782)16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Dillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374454)15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia Johnson Walden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34383129)17 , for the following reasons: Adhere to the discrepancy's on docket nos. 19 and 20.; (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 11/28 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia Johnson Walden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34383129)17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 11/21/22, Dkt. 7. (lt)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 11/28 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374782)16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Dillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374454)15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 11/21/22, Dkt. 7. (lt)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/28 2:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC, upon Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Young Doo, Jr., Accountant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/28 1:57 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia Johnson Walden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34383129) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/23 1:35 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374782) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/23 1:23 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Dillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34374454) filed by plaintiff Sazerac Brands, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 11/22 8:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov." [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Meredith Bayer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
Related: [-]
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R Dillon. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
Related: [-]
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cynthia J. Walden. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/21 2:38 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Allocated Liquor LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:25 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 11/21 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
6 6 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/18 6:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC identifying Sazerac Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 11/18 6:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/18 6:25 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (L.R. 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC, identifying Sazerac Company, Inc.. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Fri 11/18 6:21 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/18 6:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC. (Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/18 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34353499 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC. (Attorney Megan Alexandra Chacon added to party SAZERAC BRANDS, LLC(pty:pla))(Chacon, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Reg. Certs. WELLER marks,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit B - Letter to Allocated Liquor