Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Kathleen Kay
Case #: 2:22-cv-06034
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2022
Terminated:Apr 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2023 6:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Citadel Completions L L C
Represented By
Ross M Raley
Stockwell Sievert Et Al
contact info
Gray I Mateo-Harris
Fox Rothschild (il)
contact info
Kelsey J Schmidt
Fox Rothschild (il)
contact info
Mayra L Bruno
Fox Rothschild (il)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas Housmans
Represented By
Douglas R Kraus
Brener & Kraus
contact info
Susannah Cooley McKinney
Brener & Kraus
contact info
Chelsea Brener Cusimano
Brener & Kraus
contact info
Marcia Suzanne Montero
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info
Meghan Elaine Carter
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/02 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41 by Nicholas Housmans (aty,Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
22 22 order Judgment - Dismissal (30,60,90 day) Fri 04/14 1:21 PM
60 DAY JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/13/2023. (crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 03/08 9:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re14 Motion for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 4/7/2023 Replies due by 4/14/2023.. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/8/2023. (crt,Petrofes, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 03/07 2:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re14 Motion for Failure to State a Claim with consent by Nicholas Housmans. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/7/2023.(aty,Cusimano, Chelsea) Modified on 3/7/2023 to capture more accurate motion event and modify docket text (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Tue 03/07 4:05 PM
Motions Transferred regarding20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re14 Motion for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel Mon 02/13 8:55 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Marcia Suzanne Montero,Meghan Elaine Carter for Nicholas Housmans. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/13/2023. (crt,Jones, P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/09 8:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 3/13/2023 Replies due by 3/20/2023.. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 2/9/2023. (crt,Petrofes, T)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Thu 02/09 8:23 AM
Motions Transferred regarding17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
17 17 motion Continue Wed 02/08 4:23 PM
MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with consent by Nicholas Housmans. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2023.(aty,Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
16 16 motion Enroll as Counsel Wed 02/08 4:20 PM
MOTION for M. Suzanne Montero and Meghan E. Carter to Enroll as Counsel by Nicholas Housmans. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/8/2023.(aty,Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Motion Setting Tue 01/24 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 2/22/2023 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 01/23 6:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Attachments: Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Exhibit A by Citadel Completions L L C.(aty,Mateo-Harris, Gray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Brief in Support of Defendant's MTD Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/23 4:36 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kelsey J Schmidt for Citadel Completions L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/23/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/20 4:24 PM
MOTION for Kelsey J. Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5432237) by Citadel Completions L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/20/2023.(aty,Mateo-Harris, Gray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing for Kelsey J. Schmidt,
Att: 2 Proposed order Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/18 1:01 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Douglas R Kraus and Susannah Cooley McKinney are terminated. Attorney Chelsea Brener Cuismano is to notify the clerk of her new address and firm affiliation once she has transitioned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/18/2023. (jud,Kay, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/17 2:37 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw Douglas Kraus as Attorney by Nicholas Housmans. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/17/2023.(aty,Kraus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order Order
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/22 11:36 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gray I Mateo-Harris for Citadel Completions L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/21/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/22 11:31 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mayra L Bruno for Citadel Completions L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/21/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/22 11:26 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Citadel Completions L L C answer due 1/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/21/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/19 6:05 PM
MOTION for Gray Mateo-Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5402440) by Citadel Completions L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/19/2022.(aty,Raley, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/19 6:00 PM
MOTION for Mayra L. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5402439) by Citadel Completions L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/19/2022.(aty,Raley, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/19 5:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Citadel Completions L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/19/2022.(Attorney Ross M Raley added to party Citadel Completions L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Raley, Ross)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Monday, November 28, 2022
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/28 1:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Citadel Completions on 11/28/2022, filed by Nicholas Housmans. (aty,Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Tue 11/22 2:20 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citadel Completions L L C. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/21 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Citadel Completions LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5373945) filed by Nicholas Housmans.(Attorney Chelsea Brener Cusimano added to party Nicholas Housmans(pty:pla))(aty,Cusimano, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed summons/writ Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/22 2:17 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]