Rodwell v. Wicomico Detention Center
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah K Chasanow |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-03014 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2022 |
Defendant
Davis
|
|
Defendant
Deniece Davis
|
|
Defendant
Elmer Barrall
|
|
Defendant
Jacob Skarson
|
|
Defendant
James Sterling
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Watson
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Daly
|
|
Defendant
Preston Foreman
|
|
Defendant
Richard Elliott III
|
|
Defendant
Sylvester Kellam
|
|
Defendant
Wicomico County, Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Wicomico Detention Center
|
|
Defendant
Zachary Emmert
|
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Michael Rodwell
|
![]() MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/19/2024. (sat, Chambers) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
61 | 61
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 03/20 11:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING60 joint motion to amend the schedule. Discovery closes and a status report is due by June 24, 2025; the dispositive motions deadline is July 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/20/2025. (sat, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
60 | 60
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Estate of Tracey Michael Rodwell(Boardman, Tiana) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |