Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Kelly F Pate
Case #: 2:22-cv-00682
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:206(d) The Equal Pay Act
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2022
Terminated:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2023 4:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Jeffrey Douglas
Represented By
Michael Luke Bendall
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Taffiny Smith Stewart
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC
526 E Three Notch St
Andalusia, AL 36420
Represented By
Michael Luke Bendall
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Taffiny Smith Stewart
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Mattress, LLC
Represented By
Michael Luke Bendall
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Taffiny Smith Stewart
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
June Simpson
526 E Three Notch St
Andalusia, AL 36420
Represented By
Michael Luke Bendall
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Taffiny Smith Stewart
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Tracy Crain, Jr.
Represented By
Whitney Morgan Brown
contact info
Allen Durham Arnold
Allen D. Arnold, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Shepard
Represented By
Whitney Morgan Brown
contact info
Allen Durham Arnold
Allen D. Arnold, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
35 35 order Judgment Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/03 1:10 PM
STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: the Court construes the 34 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement to include a motion to dismiss this case with prejudice; it is ORDERED as follows: 1. The 34 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement with Settlement Agreement is GRANTED, and the settlement agreement is APPROVED. 2. The 34 joint Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. 3. All claims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE on the terms agreed to by the parties. 4. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 5. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/3/2023. (furn: Calendar, kf, lw) (term: FPC set for 04/11/2024; Jury Trial set for 06/03/2024) (bes, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
34 34 motion Settlement Tue 09/26 8:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement by Brian Tracy Crain, Jr, James Shepard, Mr. Mattress, LLC, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Jeffrey Douglas, June Simpson.(Arnold, Allen) Modified on 9/26/2023 to clarify text and add DFTs as filers (bes, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Judgment
Monday, March 27, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/27 2:03 PM
STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: setting out briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/27/2023. (cwl, )
Related: [-]
32 32 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/27 2:01 PM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: setting a Pretrial Conference for 4/11/2024 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate, in CR 5A FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; DIRECTING the parties to prepare a joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2024; Jury Trial set for 6/3/2024 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate, in Montgomery, AL; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 11/13/2023; Mediation Notice due not more than 5 days after the Settlement Conference; Amendments to Pleadings must be filed by Plaintiff by 4/28/2023, and by Defendant by 5/26/2023; Discovery Cutoff completed by 10/10/2023, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/27/2023. (Furnished: Calendar & KF)(am, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
31 31 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 03/08 3:28 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/23 9:40 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/9/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 2/23/2023. (cwl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
29 29 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/22 3:23 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for (DFTs) Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson. (bes, )
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/22 3:21 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for (PLFs) Brian Tracy Crain, Jr, James Shepard. (bes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/03 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Luke Bendall on behalf of Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson (Bendall, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
26 26 5 pgs order Order Wed 02/01 1:53 PM
ORDER: The parties should now confirm the decision to consent or request reassignment in writing by completing the appropriate attached form. The completed form should be sent to the Clerk of Court by 02/22/2023. Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 02/01/2023. (tha, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/30 4:40 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Mr. Mattress, LLC.(Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/30 4:38 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC.(Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/30 4:36 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Jeffrey Douglas.(Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/30 4:32 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by June Simpson.(Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/20 2:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; DFTs are to file their answer on or before 1/30/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/20/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/20 12:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, on or Before January 30, 2023 by Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson. (Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 01/20 12:48 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson re18 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Wed 01/11 1:29 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to counsel for Mr. Mattress, LLC, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Jeffrey Douglas, June Simpson; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/23/2023.(es, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment
17 17 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/11 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTS) Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson. (es, )
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/11 11:23 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, June Simpson. (Stewart, Taffiny) Modified on 1/11/2023 to clarify text (es, )
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/11 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taffiny Smith Stewart on behalf of Jeffrey Douglas, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Mr. Mattress, LLC, June Simpson (Stewart, Taffiny)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/11 1:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/11/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (es, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
14 14 service Return Receipt Card Wed 01/04 3:13 PM
Return Receipt Card for June Simpson served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return Receipt Card Wed 01/04 3:12 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Harold's Fur signed by Paula Harr for Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/04 3:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mt. Mattress c/o Jeffrey Douglas on 1/1/2023, filed by Brian Tracy Crain, Jr, James Shepard. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/04 3:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Jeffrey Douglas on 01/01/2023, filed by Brian Tracy Crain, Jr, James Shepard. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/09 12:28 PM
Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Shepard, Brian Tracy Crain, Jr.; Jeffrey Douglas served on 1/1/2023, answer due 1/23/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc.11 for PDF) (es, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/09 1:01 PM
Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Shepard, Brian Tracy Crain, Jr.; Mr. Mattress, LLC served on 1/1/2023, answer due 1/23/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc.12 for PDF) (es, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
10 10 service Alias Summons Wed 12/28 2:47 PM
Alias Summons issued as to Jeffrey Douglas, Mr. Mattress, LLC. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Alias Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cwl, )
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proposed Summons Wed 12/28 2:41 PM
Proposed Alias Summons For Douglas and Mr. Mattress (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 12/28/2022 to clarify as alias (cwl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 12/27 3:04 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Douglas & Mr. Mattress, LLC filed by filed by James Shepard, Brian Tracy Crain, Jr . (Arnold, Allen) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/27/2022 to show the names and addresses on the envelopes) (amf, ). Modified on 12/27/2022 (amf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 11/28 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Mr. Mattress, LLC, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Jeffrey Douglas, June Simpson; NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (es, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Mon 11/28 10:51 AM
Proposed Summons (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/23 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiffs Brian Tracy Crain, Jr, James Shepard. (es, )
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/23 5:22 PM
Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as presiding Judge. (es, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Wed 11/23 12:49 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Shepard. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Wed 11/23 12:49 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brian Tracy Crain, Jr. (Arnold, Allen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/23 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mr. Mattress, LLC, Harold's Furniture & Flooring LLC, Jeffrey Douglas, June Simpson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3325955.), filed by Brian Tracy Crain, Jr., James Shepard. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/21/2023.(Arnold, Allen) (es, ). Modified on 11/23/2022 to list all parties by name, add civil coversheet and add jury demand. (es, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/23/2022) Civil Coversheet