Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janice D Loyd
Case #: 5:22-bk-12739
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2022
Dismissed:Nov 28, 2022
Terminated:Jan 13, 2023

Debtor
Tinker Federal Credit Union
PO Box 45750
Tinker AFB, OK 73145-0750
Represented By
Tinker Federal Credit Union
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Sara Liggins Revocable Living Trust
2304 West Hefner Rd Unit 20434
Oklahoma City, OK 73156
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Trustee 215 Dean A. McGee Ave., 4th Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Sunday, January 15, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/15 11:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Final Decree - chp 11 & 12
Friday, January 13, 2023
4 4 order Final Decree - chp 11 & 12 Fri 01/13 11:33 AM
Final Decree. Case has been Dismissed. Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Loyd. Time signed: 11:25 cc: ECF Participants Service by dcus Date: 1/13/23 (dcus, ca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/30 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case
Monday, November 28, 2022
2 2 order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case Mon 11/28 4:19 PM
Sua Sponte Order Dismissing Case , Dismissing Involuntary Petition. Signed by Judge Loyd. Time signed: 16:04 cc: Debtor, Sara Liggins and U.S. Trustee Service by dmcge Date: 11/28/2022 Related [+]. (dmcge, ca)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Tinker Federal Credit Union, Petitioning Creditor Sara Liggins Revocable Living Trust
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
1 1 30+ pgs misc (auto) Involuntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 11/23 2:32 PM
Chapter 11 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Re: Tinker Federal Credit Union Filed by Sara Liggins Revocable Living Trust (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-]
court (auto) Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 11/24 5:30 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1738.00 by DW. Receipt # 339533. (admin)
Related: [-]