Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:22-cv-02132
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2022
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 24, 2023 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Pandrol, Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way, Ste. 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
Marykate E. Williams
King & Ballow - Nashville
contact info
Mark E. Hunt
King & Ballow - Nashville
contact info
Jennifer J. Dawson
Marshall & Melhorn
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Heilman
1140 East Riverview Ave. Apt. 5C
Napoleon, OH 43545
Represented By
Francis J. Landry
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info
Katherine Anne Pawlak Macek
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pandrol USA, LP
Terminated: 01/10/2023
25 Interstate Drive
Napoleon, OH 43545

GPO Mar 22 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Defendant's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/22/2024. (B,JL)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 22, 2024
26 26 order Judgment Fri 03/22 1:43 PM
Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the related25 Memorandum Opinion and Order issued this same date, the Court ORDERS this case be DISMISSED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/22/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
25 25 19 pgs order Order on Sealed Motion Fri 03/22 1:40 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Defendant's22 Motion for Summary Judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/22/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
24 24 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Tue 01/02 12:04 PM
SEALED Document: Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Pandrol, Inc.. Related document(s)19 ,22 ,23 . (Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
23 23 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Wed 12/20 3:53 PM
SEALED Document: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Heilman. Related document(s)19 ,22 .(Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Trisha Ross,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Deposition of Trisha Ross,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Deposition of Trisha Ross,
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Deposition of Trisha Ross,
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Deposition of Trisha Ross
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
22 22 motion SEALED MOTION Tue 11/21 9:32 AM
SEALED Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support 19 filed by Defendant Pandrol, Inc.. Related document(s)19 .(Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Daniel Heilman's depo,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Exhibits from Daniel Heilman's depo,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Trisha Ross depo
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 09/13 10:48 AM
Minutes of Telephone Status Conference [non-document] held on 9/13/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Francis J. Landry; Defendant appeared by attorneys Jennifer J. Dawson, Mark E. Hunt. Parties advise as to case status. The Court finds a settlement conference at this juncture to be futile. The Settlement Conference previously set for 10/3/2023 is VACATED. Time: 10 minutes. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
order Order Mon 09/11 2:44 PM
Order: [non-document] At the request of the parties, Telephone Status Conference SET for 9/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/11/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Motion to continue Fri 07/28 1:00 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's20 Motion to continue. The Settlement Conference previously set for 8/16/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted via email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 9/28/2023. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/28/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
20 20 motion Continue Fri 07/21 9:31 AM
Motion to continue/reschedule Settlement Conference filed by Defendant Pandrol, Inc.. Related document(s)17 . (Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
19 19 order Protective Order Thu 05/25 10:14 AM
Protective Order regarding confidential materials. Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/25/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
18 18 oth_doc Proposed Order Wed 05/24 2:42 PM
Proposed Order Stipulated (Proposed) Protective Order filed by Pandrol, Inc.. (Hunt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
17 17 4 pgs order Order Tue 04/25 11:32 AM
Order: Settlement Conference SET for 8/16/2023 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted via email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 8/11/2023. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/25/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Tue 04/25 11:14 AM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference held via telephone on 4/25/2023 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared by attorney Francis J. Landry; Defendant appeared by attorneys Jennifer J. Dawson and Mark E. Hunt. Case is assigned to proceed on the STANDARD track. Parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 5/25/2023. Discovery cut-off dates: Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 10/2/2023; Defendant's expert disclosures by 11/14/2023; Liability and Damages by 12/15/2023. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 6/15/2023. Dispositive motions by 1/2/2024. Settlement Conference SET for 8/16/2023 at 1:00 PM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Order to follow. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/25/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
order Order Fri 04/21 11:27 AM
Order: [non-document] The Case Management Conference previously set for 4/25/2023 at 1:00 PM will now be held at 9:30 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Change in time only. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/21/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
15 15 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Mon 04/17 2:21 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
14 14 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 04/12 12:31 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held via telephone on 4/25/2023 at 1:00 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 4/12/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Monday, March 27, 2023
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 03/27 4:42 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's10 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Mark E. Hunt for Pandrol, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/27/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 03/27 4:46 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's11 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Marykate E. Williams for Pandrol, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/27/2023. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
13 13 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 03/24 1:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pandrol, Inc.. (Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/24 1:22 PM
Answer to7 Amended complaint, filed by Pandrol, Inc.. (Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/24 1:18 PM
Motion for attorney Marykate E. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11913010, filed by Defendant Pandrol, Inc..(Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Marykate E. Williams
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/24 1:14 PM
Motion for attorney Mark E. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11912959, filed by Defendant Pandrol, Inc..(Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark E. Hunt
Thursday, March 23, 2023
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 03/23 12:06 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J. Dawson filed by on behalf of Pandrol, Inc.. (Dawson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/30 12:55 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Daniel Heilman. Pandrol, Inc. waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 filed on behalf of Daniel Heilman (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/10 12:41 PM
First Amended complaint against Pandrol, Inc.. Filed by Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Copy of OCRC/EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-copy of Right to Sue issued by EEOC,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Copy of Right to Sue issued by OCRC
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
6 6 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 11/30 9:07 AM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons-directed to Defendant Pandrol USA, LP filed by Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 11/30 9:05 AM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons-directed to Defendant Pandrol, Inc. filed by Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
4 4 order Initial Order - Judge Zouhary Mon 11/28 9:03 AM
FILING ERROR-Issued on wrong case. Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/28/2022. (S,Ja) Modified on 11/28/2022 (S,Ja)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service - JZ Mon 11/28 9:05 AM
FILING ERROR-Issued on wrong case. Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (S,Ja) Modified on 11/28/2022 (S,Ja)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Mon 11/28 2:41 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis . Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/28/2022. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 11/25 10:49 AM
FILING ERROR. Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,Ja) Modified on 11/25/2022 (S,Ja)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/25 9:32 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Application Form AO239) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Bankruptcy Appeal Complaint Fri 11/25 9:31 AM
Complaint ; Jury demand Endorsed Heron, with jury demand against All Defendants.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Daniel Heilman. (Landry, Francis) Modified to match docket caption on 11/25/2022 (S,Ja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-copy of Notice of Right to Sue issued by EEOC,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-copy of Right to Sue issued by Ohio Civil Rights Commission,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 11/25 10:47 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,Ja)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 11/25 10:48 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,Ja)
Related: [-]