Joel Humphrey et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-03754 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2023 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Joel Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monique Humphrey
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Johnson Controls International, plc
Terminated: 01/20/2023
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 01/20/2023
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Martin Burg, Linda Molek, Nancy Pelyak, Mary White, William White, John Coppa, Victor Myers, Margery Weiner, Steven Weiner, Robert Trump, Donald Williams, Marva Williams, Matthew McHale, Louis Zimmerman, Rosemarie Love, Joseph Romagnoli, Rosalie Romagnoli, Barbara Ann Wernick, Richard Wernick, Thomas Kehoe, Linda Carestia, Ronald Carestia, Deidre Bulick, Jeffrey Bulick, Ty Buffington, Ted Boudalis, John Gnapp, Eugene Bowerman, Sharon Bowerman, David Perea, Dipesh Sharma, Joel Humphrey, Monique Humphrey, Heather Wierzbicky, James Wierzbicky, Kevin Kromminga, Gail Bressman, Leo Bressman Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Green, Chelsie) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs in 27 Actions Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Green, Chelsie) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, The, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Amerex Corporation, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Daikin America Inc, Du Pont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, United Technologies Corporation, filed by Joel Humphrey. Service due by 4/20/2023 (Pendley, Madeline) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/28/2022), Joel Humphrey et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3754-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 11/28 4:15 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 10/28/2022), Joel Humphrey et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-3754-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10773958.), filed by Joel Humphrey. Service due by 1/26/2023(sshe, ) |