Member Case
Lead case is: 3:22-bk-19361

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:22-bk-19366
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BlockFi Wallet LLC
201 Montgomery St Apt 263
Jersey City, NJ 07302-5057
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Debtor
BlockFi Inc.
201 Montgomery Street Suite 263
Jersey City, NJ 07302
Represented By
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Monday, January 09, 2023
court Hearing Held Mon 01/09 2:51 PM
Minute of 1/9/23; OUTCOME: Held Related [+] (km)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing (Upload)
Friday, December 02, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/05 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/02 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
4 4 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Wed 11/30 8:29 AM
CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/9/2023 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of BlockFi Wallet LLC, BlockFi Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/28/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Consent) filed by Debtor BlockFi Wallet LLC
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Wed 11/30 11:48 AM
Remark. THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS ARE DUE ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 11, 2023: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals and Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H (llb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
3 3 order Joint Administration Tue 11/29 4:37 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 22-19361 Member Cases: 22-19366 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/29/2022. (bwj)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, November 28, 2022
2 2 motion Joint Administration Mon 11/28 2:01 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 22-19361 22-19363 22-19365 22-19366 22-19367 22-19368 22-19370 22-19371 22-19374 Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of BlockFi Wallet LLC. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/28 10:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of BlockFi Wallet LLC, BlockFi Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/28/2023. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Mon 11/28 11:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 22-19366 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44652995, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Remark Mon 11/28 11:37 AM
Remark: Case related to 22-19361 22-19363 22-19365 22-19367 22-29368 22-19370 22-19371 and 22-19374 (mrg)
Related: [-]
order Text Order Mon 11/28 4:18 PM
Text Order: The Court notes that several First Day Motions are pending in the BlockFi Inc. bankruptcy case 22-19361 and that Motions for Joint Administration are pending in each of the related cases: 22-19363 22-19365 22-19366 22-19367 22-19368 22-19370 22-19371 and 22-19374 Until such time as the Motions for Joint Administration are addressed and an order is entered establishing the lead case, parties should consult the docket in the first-filed case, BlockFi Inc. 22-19361 and the Courts website http://www.njb.uscourts.gov/BlockFi for further information related to these cases. Signed on 11/28/2022. (wiq)
Related: [-]