Welch v. Continental Finance Company, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-03169
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-03169
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:22-ap-00247 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Continental Finance Company, LLC
121 Continental Drive Suite 108
Newark, DE 19713 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Ave. #401
Tampa, FL 33626 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Wed 03/20 10:28 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Order Vacating Default Judgment. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
order
Set Aside or Vacate
Tue 03/19 4:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Default Judgment . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Motion to Set Aside or Vacate (AP)
Mon 03/18 1:25 PM
Unopposed Motion to Vacate Default Judgment Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
court
Compromise Cross-Reference
Wed 03/06 10:39 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-03169-CPM, Doc. No. 35 . (Juan) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
court
Compromise Cross-Reference
Wed 03/06 10:36 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-03169-CPM, Doc. No. 32 . (Juan) Modified on 3/6/2024 (Juan) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Tue 01/02 7:40 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
order
Reopen Case
Fri 12/22 11:42 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Case . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Motion to Reopen Adversary
Tue 12/19 2:19 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/29 3:04 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-247 Closed. (Margaret) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Mon 08/14 9:47 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion for Judgment by Default against Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Sunday, August 13, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 08/14 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/13/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
order
Judgment
Fri 08/11 3:17 PM
Final Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Amount Awarded: $3732.00 . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Ryan S.) |
|
35 | 35
order
Default Judgment
Fri 08/11 3:13 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Continental Finance Company, LLC . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 08/07 7:44 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 08/04 7:37 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Reschedule Hearing
Thu 08/03 7:58 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference . Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP)
Tue 08/01 5:19 AM
Motion to Reschedule Hearing On August 7, 2023 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Tue 05/30 9:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 05/24/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
court
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 05/22 1:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Continental Finance Company, LLC Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve . (Lisa P.) |
|
28 | 28
order
Virtual Order Vacating Order (TEXT ONLY)
Mon 05/22 1:51 PM
Order Vacating Order on Motion for Entry of Default (AP). THIS CASE came on for consideration on the Court's own motion for the purpose of considering the entry of an appropriate order. The Court has considered the record and finds that on May 22, 2023, this Court erroneously entered an order titled Order on Motion for Entry of Default (AP) in the above-captioned case and should, therefore, be vacated. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Order on Motion for Entry of Default (AP) is hereby vacated. SO ORDERED by Judge Catherine Peek McEwen (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) |
|
27 | 27
order
Default
Mon 05/22 11:24 AM
Order Denying Motion for Entry of Default . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lisa P.) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Motion for Entry of Default (AP)
Fri 05/19 4:36 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against Continental Finance Company, LLC Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 05/05 9:17 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
order
Reschedule Hearing
Thu 05/04 12:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference . Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2023 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP)
Thu 05/04 4:22 AM
Motion to Reschedule Hearing On May 15, 2023 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Summons Service Executed
Tue 04/04 1:32 PM
Service Executed on Continental Finance Company, LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Kenneth C Grace on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Grace, Kenneth) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Tue 04/04 8:55 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
court
Alias or Pluries Summons Issued
Mon 04/03 1:30 PM
Pluries Summons Issued on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 05/3/2023. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Request for Alias or Pluries Summons
Mon 04/03 1:09 PM
Pluries Summons Requested on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 05/3/2023. (Alias or Pluries Summons Pending.) Filed by Thomas A Lash. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
18 | 18
order
Extend Time
Mon 04/03 1:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Susan M.) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion to Extend Time (AP)
Wed 03/29 6:43 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Summons Service Executed
Mon 03/13 2:12 PM
Service Executed on Continental Finance Company, LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Kenneth C Grace on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Grace, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Fri 03/10 1:44 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
court
Alias or Pluries Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 11:30 AM
Pluries Summons Issued on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 04/10/2023. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Request for Alias or Pluries Summons
Thu 03/09 11:15 AM
Pluries Summons Requested on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 04/10/2023. (Alias or Pluries Summons Pending.) Filed by Thomas A Lash. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
order
Extend Time
Thu 03/09 11:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint, 14 Days. . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ellen M.) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion to Extend Time (AP)
Tue 03/07 5:09 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Sunday, February 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP)
Mon 02/06 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 02/05/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference
Fri 02/03 8:00 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Margaret) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Summons Service Executed
Mon 01/23 1:10 PM
Service Executed on Continental Finance Company LLC. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Kenneth C Grace on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Grace, Kenneth) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proof of Service (BK)
Mon 01/23 9:28 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch . (Lash, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
court
Alias or Pluries Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 8:30 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 02/22/2023. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Request for Alias or Pluries Summons
Mon 01/23 6:33 AM
Alias Summons Requested on Continental Finance Company, LLC. Answer Due 02/22/2023. (Alias or Pluries Summons Pending.) Filed by Thomas A Lash. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Extend Time
Fri 01/20 4:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Susan M.) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion to Extend Time (AP)
Wed 01/18 6:57 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
ADI - Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 12/01 11:00 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 01/02/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ADI - Complaint - Original
Mon 11/28 12:02 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Continental Finance Company, LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 ]. (Lash, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |