Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Indira Talwani
Case #: 1:22-cv-12026
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2022
Terminated:Dec 23, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Gary Chen
Defendant
Stephen Daniel
Defendant
Hodes Jonathan
Defendant
Gregory Rueb
Defendant
Paul Stoller
Defendant
Stubbs Alderton & Markiles LLP
Defendant
The Rueb Law Firm
Plaintiff
Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP
Represented By
Kevin T. Peters
Gesmer Updegrove LLP
contact info
Lauren B. Haskins
Gesmer Updegrove LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John A. Dalimonte
Represented By
Kevin T. Peters
Gesmer Updegrove LLP
contact info
Lauren B. Haskins
Gesmer Updegrove LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, December 23, 2022
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/23 1:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by John A. Dalimonte, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP. (Peters, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/15 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren B. Haskins on behalf of John A. Dalimonte, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP (Haskins, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 11/30 12:04 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jared I. Levinthal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/30 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of JARED I. LEVINTHAL Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9607334 by John A. Dalimonte, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP.(Peters, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/29 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 11/29 9:25 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/28 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against The Rueb Law Firm, Gregory Rueb, Hodes Jonathan, Stubbs Alderton & Markiles LLP, Gary Chen, Paul Stoller, Stephen Daniel Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9604901 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Dalimonte, Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP.(Peters, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form