Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 2:22-cv-00232
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2022
Terminated:Jun 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC
Represented By
Kenneth G. Menendez
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Lucas Zavoli
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp - Atlanta, Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery S. Copeland
Represented By
Julie Anne Hoehn Burke
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Don Jackson Automotive Group, LLC
Terminated: 02/17/2023


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, June 09, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/09 1:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii filed by Jeffery S. Copeland. (ddm)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 06/09 12:47 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal With Prejudice by Jeffery S. Copeland. (Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 06/09 1:32 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/09 1:33 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
18 18 misc Leave of Absence Mon 03/20 9:23 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 31, April 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, by Julie Anne Hoehn Burke. (Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/14 9:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC. (Zavoli, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 03/13 11:10 AM
ORDER directing that Defendant file a Certificate of Interested Persons no later than March 22, 2023. Failure to obey a lawful order of this Court could result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 03/13/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
15 15 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 03/03 11:23 AM
Initial Disclosures by Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC.(Zavoli, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Witness List,
Att: 2 Exhibit Attachment B - Expert Witness List and Written Reports,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachment C - Document List and Descriptions,
Att: 4 Exhibit Attachment D - Copies and Descriptions,
Att: 5 Exhibit Attachment E - Copy of Insurance Agreement
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/28 3:05 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC.(Zavoli, Lucas)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/28 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Zavoli on behalf of Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC (Zavoli, Lucas)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 02/28 10:42 AM
ORDER directing Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint NO LATER THAN 14 DAYS from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 02/28/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Tue 02/28 10:10 AM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 02/28/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/28 10:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties'9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The discovery period began 30 days after the first defendant appeared by filing an answer to the complaint and is scheduled to continue for four months from that date, or until June 26, 2023. Defendant shall file the Certificate of Interested Persons required by LR 3.3, NDGa. no later than seven days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 02/28/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 02/27 5:01 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC. (Menendez, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/27 11:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery and Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Jeffery S. Copeland.(Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 9:10 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages against Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC, Don Jackson Automotive Group, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Jeffery S. Copeland.(Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/27 4:13 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Derek Jackson Automotive Group, LLC. Discovery ends on 6/26/2023.(Menendez, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/05 10:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffery S. Copeland. Don Jackson Automotive Group, LLC waiver mailed on 11/29/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. (Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
utility Docket Correction Tue 11/29 3:50 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re 4 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom. Order docketed in the incorrect civil action. (sk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 11/28 3:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Jeffery S. Copeland. (Burke, Julie)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 11/28 11:47 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Don Jackson Automotive Group, LLC. (ddm)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/28 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Jeffery S. Copeland. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BGANDC-12220145)(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet