Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:22-bk-16625

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:22-ap-01437
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Roger Wesley Goindoo
501 SE 2nd St #537
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Roger Wesley Goindoo
contact info
Plaintiff
Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC
110 S.E. 6th Street Suite 1500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Charles M Tatelbaum
contact info
Ryan H Lehrer
contact info
Plaintiff
Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC
110 S.E. 6th Street Suite 1500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Charles M Tatelbaum
contact info
Ryan H Lehrer
contact info
Plaintiff
Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC
110 S.E. 6th Street Suite 1500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Charles M Tatelbaum
contact info
Ryan H Lehrer
contact info
Plaintiff
Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC
110 S.E. 6th Street Suite 1500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Charles M Tatelbaum
contact info
Ryan H Lehrer
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/09 1:20 PM
Adversary Case 0:22-ap-1437 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 10/03 4:20 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiffs Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC. (Lehrer, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
18 18 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 07/10 5:16 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Charles M Tatelbaum Related [+]. (Tatelbaum, Charles)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic)
Saturday, July 01, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/02 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Granting Abatement (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC). (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Thursday, June 29, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 06/29 2:46 PM
Order Granting Abatement Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC
Friday, March 10, 2023
15 15 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 03/10 10:46 AM
Amended Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiffs Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC. (Lehrer, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/21 11:38 AM
Notice of Filing of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents , Filed by Defendant Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/21 11:37 AM
Notice of Filing of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories , Filed by Defendant Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
12 12 misc Interrogatories Tue 02/14 12:57 PM
Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories Served Upon Brianna Bowes, derivatively as a member of the Nexx Health Entitites Filed by Defendant Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Production of Documents Tue 02/14 12:55 PM
First Request for Production of Documents from Brianna Bowes, derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Entities Filed by Defendant Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
10 10 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 02/03 4:04 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
9 9 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Thu 02/02 3:51 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiffs Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC. (Lehrer, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/22 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order. A final pre-trial hearing will be held on October 3, 2023 at 9:30a.m. in person at The United States Bankruptcy Court, 299 East Broward Blvd., Courtroom 308, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301.
Thursday, January 19, 2023
7 7 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 01/19 4:48 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Ryan H Lehrer Related [+]. (Lehrer, Ryan)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic)
6 6 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/19 2:00 PM
Scheduling Order. A final pre-trial hearing will be held on October 3, 2023 at 9:30a.m. in person at The United States Bankruptcy Court, 299 East Broward Blvd., Courtroom 308, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/28 3:51 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Roger Wesley Goindoo. (Schulte, Nemia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
4 4 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 12/01 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Charles M Tatelbaum Related [+]. (Tatelbaum, Charles)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
3 3 7 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 11/29 3:11 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Weldon, Melva)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 11/29 3:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Roger Wesley Goindoo Answer Due 12/29/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Weldon, Melva)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01437 Complaint by Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC against Roger Wesley Goindoo. Nature of Suit:,(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Plaintiff Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC
Monday, November 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/28 3:49 PM
Adversary case 22-01437 Complaint by Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Boca, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health of West Palm Beach, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Health Doral, LLC, Brianna Bowes Derivatively as a member of Nexx Holdings, LlC against Roger Wesley Goindoo. Nature of Suit:,(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Lehrer, Ryan)
Related: [-]