Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Referred: Stephanie K Bowman
Case #: 1:22-cv-00701
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2023 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Crystal Care of Ironton, LLC
544 Enterprise Dr. Suite G
Lewis Center, OH 43035
Represented By
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Hillstone Healthcare Inc.
200 Public Square, Suite 2300
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
McKenna Health Care of Franklin Furnace Inc.
5375 Teeter Road
Butler, OH 44822
Represented By
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
McKenna Health Care of Portsmouth, Inc.
5375 Teeter Road
Butler, OH 44822
Represented By
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
OneSource Employee Management, LLC
3958-D Brown Park Drive
Hilliard, OH 43026
Represented By
Michael B Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Jeremy David Smith
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Baldwin
24 Township Road 332
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Wilson
62 Twp. Rd. 1161 Trailer 7D
Proctorville, OH 45669
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Wheeler
2983 County Rd. 61
Kittshill, OH 45645
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Thomas
1173 County Rd. 1 Lot 38
South Point, OH 45680
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Nadia Samokovski
108 Meadow Lane
South Point, OH 45680
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Roar
10 Private Drive 411
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Natasha Perkins
2115 N. 4th Street
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Nelson
2761 Dorado Ct.
Burlington, KY 41005
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Gina Moore
92b Stanley Street
Proctorville, OH 45669
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Danny Millhouse
2435 S. 10th Street
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Frazee
611 Buckhorn St. Apt. A
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Colley
121 Laroque Lane
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Rhiannon Herbert
Mansell Law, LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2023
ORDER STAYING CASE: This matter is before the Court following a Preliminary Pretrial Conference with the parties. The parties have submitted their Rule 26(f) report, wherein they propose dates for discovery. The parties disagree on how to proceed with discovery. Plaintiffs believe that discovery should proceed on the definition and scope of the proposed collective class. Defendants contend that discovery should be stayed pending the Sixth Circuit's decision in Brooke Clark, et al. v. A&L Home Care and Training Center, LLC, Nos. 22-3101 & 22-3102 . Upon consideration of the parties' interests, judicial economy, and efficient litigation, the Court STAYS this matter pending the Sixth Circuit's resolution of Clarke . The parties are DIRECTED to notify the Court when the Sixth Circuit decides Clarke or if they reach a settlement. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 03/27/2023. (kaf)
GPO Jan 16 2025
ORDER AND OPINION - The Court ORDERS the following: 1. The Court LIFTS the STAY entered in this matter; 2. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Make Preliminary Determination on Similarly Sihiated Individuals (Doc. 26); a. Plaintiffs' Conditional Certification is GRANTED; b. Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice is APPROVED; and c. Defendants SHALL PROVIDE to Plaintiffs, within fourteen (14)days from the date of this Order/ a list of all potential opt-in plaintiffs who worked for Defendants during the timeframe specified in Plaintiffs' modified Proposed Class definition. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 01/16/2025. (bjc)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
55 55 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/09 1:56 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Christopher Baldwin, Ryan Colley, Susan Frazee, Danny Millhouse, Gina Moore, Sherry Nelson, Natasha Perkins, Stephanie Roar, Nadia Samokovski, Jennifer Thomas, Adrian Wheeler, Kevin Wilson of Filing Consent Forms (Twenty-First) (Herbert, Rhiannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
54 54 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/02 6:59 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Christopher Baldwin, Ryan Colley, Susan Frazee, Danny Millhouse, Gina Moore, Sherry Nelson, Natasha Perkins, Stephanie Roar, Nadia Samokovski, Jennifer Thomas, Adrian Wheeler, Kevin Wilson of Filing Consent Forms (Twentieth) (Herbert, Rhiannon)
Related: [-]