KELLEY v 3M COMPANY
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-23757 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-02802 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2023 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
PAUL B. KELLEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 12/14 1:10 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by PAUL B. KELLEY. (BUXNER, EVAN) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/14 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN D BUXNER on behalf of PAUL B. KELLEY (BUXNER, EVAN) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/14 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMIRA KHAZAELI on behalf of PAUL B. KELLEY (KHAZAELI, SAMIRA) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/14 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD on behalf of PAUL B. KELLEY (MAYFIELD, NICHOLAS) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/29 2:48 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 12/19/2022 .) (emailed to attorney Jason B. Epps) NEF to William Sieben. (djb) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 11/29 2:43 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (emailed to attorney Jason B. Epps) NEF to William Sieben. (djb) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement | ||
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 11/29 2:15 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-02802. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/29 11:47 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-181) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Jason B. Epps as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
5 | 5 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-2802 (JRT/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9868689) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/29/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |