District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amy Berman Jackson
Case #: 1:22-cv-03603
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
CARLYLE GROUP, INC.
Defendant
MICHAEL BROGAN
Defendant
MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Defendant
MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Defendant
KEVIN CODY
Defendant
MUGE CODY
Defendant
BONNIE COOK
Defendant
JOHN GUARNIERI
Defendant
MARK CROLL
Defendant
KATHRYN ROMANCE
Defendant
BRIAN EARHART
Plaintiff
MICHAEL NOMURA
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN LOGAN
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC NELSON
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALTON MCNEIL
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BONITA CROMARTIE
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LADARIUS PHILLIPS
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWARD PONDER
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
YUMUL TRISTAN
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMECIA TURNER
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFERY WILLIS
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL ABERNATHY
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON FOSTER
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CEDRICK ARTHUR
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LARRY BESS
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DARIUS CAIN
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCUS CARTER
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIO CAVAZOS
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MIKE COWLEY
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
VERNON DASHER
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MISAEL DIAZ
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FRANK LAMBEY
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE FREEMAN
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GASTON
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DELONTE GREEN
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEROME GREENE
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER JACOBS
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN JAKUBOWSKI
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE KENDRICK
Represented By
Joseph Aloysius Hennessey
Law Office Of Joseph Hennessey, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order .Order Thu 11/07 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER. On October 4, 2024, the Court stayed this case, granting defendant ManTech's unopposed motion to "stay further proceedings as to ManTech in this case until the Court has issued rulings on the pending dispositive motions here and in Hawkins v. ManTech, No. 15-cv2105." See37 ManTech's Unopposed Mot. to Stay at 2; Minute Order (Oct. 4, 2024). In doing so, the Court raised the concept of consolidating this case with Hawkins, in the interests of efficiency, but the parties do not appear to share the Court's interest. See44 Joint Notice Regarding Consolidation. Therefore, the Court will defer any further consideration of consolidation until after the pending motion for summary judgment in Hawkins has been resolved. The Court certainly does not agree with plaintiffs' suggestion that consolidation would afford an opportunity to make an end run around its ruling that there would be no further amendments of the complaint, particularly after the Abernathy plaintiffs have already had the opportunity to utilize what was learned in discovery in the Hawkins case to craft what was, in effect, a fifth amended complaint that followed the Court's denial of the Hawkins plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a fourth. Nor is the Court inclined to invite a "reformulation" of the motion for class certification. Instead, the stay of this case remains in effect until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/7/24. (DMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 11/07 10:31 AM
Case Stayed. (zdrf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/17 5:43 PM
NOTICE (Joint) Regarding Consolidation by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Muge Cody by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Kevin Cody by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Kathryn Romance by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Michael Brogan by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Bonnie Cook by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
38 38 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Thu 10/10 6:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re The Carlyle Group, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/04 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting37 motion to stay proceedings as to ManTech International Corporation and ManTech Telecommunications and Information Systems Corporation ("ManTech"). It is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case as to ManTech, including the obligation to file an answer to Count I of the First Amended Complaint, are stayed pending further order of the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer and file notice by October 18, 2024 setting forth their position, or separate positions, on whether this case should be consolidated with Hawkins v. ManTech, 15-cv-2105, and if so, what the schedule would be for discovery in the Abernathy matter, if any. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/4/24. (DMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Fri 10/04 4:23 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Stayed (zdrf) Modified on 10/4/2024 (zdrf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Unstayed Fri 10/04 4:32 PM
Case Unstayed (zdrf)
Related: [-]
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Stayed (zdrf) Modified on 10/4/2024 (zdrf).
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
37 37 motion Stay Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Answer and Further Proceedings by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 27, 2024
36 36 41 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Fri 09/27 3:27 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 ManTech's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint. ManTech's motion to dismiss the TVPRA claim at Count 1 is denied, and its motion to dismiss the claim for medical monitoring at Count 3 and the RICO claim at Count 4 are granted. Counts 3 and 4 are DISMISSED. The motion to dismiss filed by The Carlyle Group and the individual defendants remains pending. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/27/24. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 09/19 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Astellas U.S. Holding, Inc. v. Fed. Ins. Co.,
Friday, March 08, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 03/08 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Doe I v. Apple (D.C. Cir.)
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
33 33 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 12/20 5:46 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Strike Class Allegations MOTION to Strike filed by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, KATHRYN ROMANCE. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 12/20 5:36 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Strike Class Allegations MOTION to Strike filed by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
31 31 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 12/19 7:10 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 MOTION for Discovery Related to Defendants Michael Brogan, Kevin Cody, Muge Cody, Kathryn Romance, and Bonnie Cook's Assertions of Lack of Contacts with Washington, DC and the United States District Court's Alleged Lack of Personal Jurisd filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ManTech Conference in Washington, DC,
Att: 2 Exhibit ManTech's Description of the Breadth of Bonnie Cook's Authority and Her Attendance at American University in Washington, DC,
Att: 3 Exhibit Systemic ManTech Recruiting of Personnel into Washington, DC Where Human Resources is a Described Responsibility of Bonnie Cook,
Att: 4 Exhibit Transcript of Cody et al. v. ManTech et al. Demonstrating Pervasive Role of Bonnie Cook and Michael Brogan in the Execution of the MRAP Repair Contract at Issue in this Litigation,
Att: 5 Exhibit Defendant Brogan Testifying About His Facility With Lobbying in Washington, DC,
Att: 6 Exhibit Kevin Cody Testifies Under Oath About Meeting with DOJ in Washington, DC to Discuss the MRAP Repair Contract,
Att: 7 Kevin Cody Testifying That he Attended George Washington University
Monday, December 18, 2023
30 30 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 12/18 9:31 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Certify Class (Partially Unopposed) filed by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/18 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting26 defendants' motion for extension of time. This case was filed by twenty-nine plaintiffs, who describe themselves as "former ManTech employees who ManTech employed illegally in Kuwait and Afghanistan." Compl.1 at 2. Plaintiffs raise allegations that are substantially similar to allegations raised in another case pending before this Court, Hawkins v. ManTech, 15-cv-2105, in which other former ManTech employees are represented by the same counsel, and the same lawyers are representing the defendants. There is a pending defense motion to dismiss the Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act ("TVPRA") claims on jurisdictional grounds in that case. Hawkins, 15-cv-2105 [Dkt. # 108]; a pending motion by the plaintiffs asking the Court to revisit its previous dismissal of the money laundering claim in that case, 15-cv-2105 [Dkt. # 116]; and a fully briefed defense motion for summary judgment on the TVPRA claims, 15-cv-2105 [Dkt. # 124]. In this case, there are pending motions to dismiss the TVPRA and other claims17 18 under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) that raise the same concerns at issue in the Hawkins case. Plaintiffs have opposed the motions in this case and have moved to take jurisdictional discovery22 . While all of that was still before the Court, plaintiffs filed a motion for class certification24 in this matter, and defendants have moved to extend the time to respond to the class certification motion until 30 days after the Court rules on their motions to dismiss. Defs. Mot.26 . Plaintiffs oppose the request -- in fact, they suggest that the claims in the Hawkins case could be stayed to enable the proposed class action to move forward. They submit that the instant case and Hawkins v. ManTech Corp. arise "from the same nucleus of operative fact," and that the proposed class action would provide "a streamlined approach to addressing questions of fact and law" in the TVPRA and laundering of monetary instruments claims in both cases. Pls. Opp.29 at 1. They add that the class certification motion "makes the case that in order to vindicate the statutory imperative of the TVPRA, all the victims of ManTech's misconduct should be before the Court in one action," and that "the Hawkins plaintiffs are willing to stay consideration of their claims against ManTech in favor of one, consolidated action in Abernathy." Id. at 1-2. But in the Courts view, this is not the appropriate way to proceed at this time, when there are pending dispositive motions in both actions that bear directly on the proposed class action. Moreover, the Hawkins case has been pending since 2015; plaintiffs in that case have filed multiple amended complaints, the Court has ruled on multiple motions to dismiss, discovery is complete, and the parties have fully briefed a motion for summary judgment, complete with hundreds of pages of exhibits. In light of all this, the Court finds that it would be inefficient to proceed to class certification before the dispositive motions have been resolved, and inappropriate to defer the resolution of the Hawkins motions any further. If defendants prevail on the motions to dismiss in either case or the pending summary judgment motion, that ruling could obviate class consideration, and if the Hawkins claims survive, consolidation of the two cases and consideration of class treatment may be appropriate at that time. Accordingly, defendants' extension motion26 is GRANTED, and it is ORDERED that briefing on the motion for class certification24 is hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/18/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
29 29 3 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 12/12 8:15 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 12/12 8:12 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Certify Class (Partially Unopposed) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Hennessey, Joseph) Modified on 12/13/2023; refiled as docket entry29 (znmw).
Related: [-]
27 27 9 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 12/12 5:17 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re22 Motion for Discovery,,, filed by MICHAEL BROGAN, KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, KATHRYN ROMANCE.(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
26 26 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/06 1:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Certify Class (Partially Unopposed) by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE.(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/06 2:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that briefing on24 plaintiffs' motion for class certification is suspended until the Court rules on26 defendants' motion for extension of time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs must file by December 13, 2023 any grounds for their opposition to the proposed stay of class certification briefing until after the Court rules on the pending motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/6/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
24 24 3 pgs motion Certify Class Mon 12/04 9:28 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joseph Hennessey in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit Trial Testimony of Kevin Cody in Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia,
Att: 4 Exhibit Wells v. Allstate Ins. Co.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Publicly Filed ManTech PeopleSoft Data,
Att: 6 Exhibit Eric Nelson ManTech Employment Contract Addendum,
Att: 7 Exhibit Frank Lambey ManTech Employment Contract Addendum,
Att: 8 Exhibit Kuwait Law Expert Witness Report Publicly Filed in United States ex rel. Hawkins et al. v. ManTech International et al,
Att: 9 Exhibit Nat'l ATM Council v. Visa, Inc.,
Att: 10 Exhibit Publicly Filed ManTech/U.S. MRAP Repair Contract Statement of Work,
Att: 11 Exhibit Turner v. Multnomah Cnty.,,
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 30, 2023
25 25 misc Sealed Document Wed 12/06 8:47 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 14) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. re19 Memorandum in Opposition. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/30 5:52 PM
NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS OPPOSE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND WILL FILE AN OPPOSITION THERETO by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS re22 Motion for Discovery,,, Order (Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Thu 11/30 12:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file UNDER SEAL [20-1], Exhibit 14 to19 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to18 Motion to Dismiss. The Court may revisit the need for a seal as the matter unfolds. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/23.(DMK)
Related: [-]
order .Order Thu 11/30 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to inform the Court of defendants' position on22 their Motion for Discovery, as required by Local Civil Rule 7(m). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
22 22 motion Discovery Wed 11/29 7:28 PM
MOTION for Discovery Related to Defendants Michael Brogan, Kevin Cody, Muge Cody, Kathryn Romance, and Bonnie Cook's Assertions of Lack of Contacts with Washington, DC and the United States District Court's Alleged Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Over Them by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Michael Brogan LinkedIn Profile,
Att: 2 Exhibit Kevin Cody LinkedIn Profile,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 22 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 11/29 6:40 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re17 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Strike, filed by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ManTech/Army MRAP Repair Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit ManTech/Army MRAP Repair Contract Modification,
Att: 3 Exhibit ManTech/Millbrook Purchase Order Requiring Millbrook to Comply with the TVPRA,
Att: 4 Exhibit Hawkins, Locklear, Hayes, Nelson, Sawyer's Opposition to ManTech's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the Third Amenas filed in Hawkins v. ManTech,
Att: 5 Exhibit ManTech/Army MRAP Repair Contract Statement of Work,
Att: 6 Exhibit Hawkins, Locklear, Hayes, Nelson, Sawyer's Motion to Reinstate Count VI of the Third Amended Complaint as filed in Hawkins v. ManTech,
Att: 7 Exhibit Hawkins, Locklear, Hayes, Nelson, Sawyer's Reply to ManTech's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reinstate Count VI of the Third Amended Complaint as filed in Hawkins v. ManTech
20 20 motion Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Wed 11/29 5:02 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 17 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 11/29 4:41 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Strike, filed by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Doe v. Apple,
Att: 2 Exhibit ManTech MRAP Repair Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit ManTech MRAP Repair Contract Modification,
Att: 4 Exhibit Millbrook Purchase Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 6 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 7 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 8 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 9 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 10 Exhibit Kevin Cody et al. v. ManTech Trial Testimony,
Att: 11 Exhibit The Carlyle Group, Inc. Purchases ManTech at $96.00 per share,
Att: 12 Exhibit The Carlyle Group Announces Intention to Purchase ManTech,
Att: 13 Exhibit The Carlyle Group is on Inquiry Notice Regarding Violations of Chapter 77 of the U.S. Code,
Att: 14 Exhibit UNDER SEAL,
Att: 15 Exhibit Michael Brogan LinkedIn Profile,
Att: 16 Exhibit Kevin Cody LinkeIn Profile,
Att: 17 Exhibit Houston v. Pavillion U.S. 2020, Inc.
Monday, October 30, 2023
18 18 3 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 10/30 5:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Strike Class Allegations by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, KATHRYN ROMANCE.(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 10/30 4:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Strike Class Allegations by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit 6
Monday, September 18, 2023
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/18 4:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' proposed briefing schedule16 , it is ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint is due by October 30, 2023; plaintiffs' opposition is due by November 29, 2023; and defendants' reply is due by December 20, 2023. The parties are reminded that in the future, any requests must be presented to the Court in the form of a motion, which may be filed as a joint or consent motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/18/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
16 16 motion Briefing Schedule Thu 09/14 2:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Fri 09/08 2:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiffs' amended complaint15 , defendants' motions to dismiss13 14 are DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
15 15 99 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/07 1:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by FRANK LAMBEY, MIKE COWLEY, EDWARD PONDER, KYLE KENDRICK, CEDRICK ARTHUR, MICHAEL ABERNATHY, JUSTIN LOGAN, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, TAMECIA TURNER, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, JEFFERY WILLIS, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, JEROME GREENE, MICHAEL NOMURA, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, DELONTE GREEN, ERIC NELSON, YUMUL TRISTAN, MARIO CAVAZOS, LARRY BESS, VERNON DASHER, MICHAEL GASTON, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, BONITA CROMARTIE, DARIUS CAIN, ALTON MCNEIL, MARCUS CARTER.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redline/Strikeout Comparison of the First Amended Complaint to the Originally-Filed Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 10, 2023
14 14 motion Dismiss Strike Thu 08/10 3:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , Or Alternatively To Strike Class Allegations by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, BRIAN EARHART, KATHRYN ROMANCE.(Thomas, Roderick). Added MOTION to Strike on 8/10/2023 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6
13 13 3 pgs motion Dismiss Strike Thu 08/10 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , Or Alternatively To Strike Class Allegations by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION.(Thomas, Roderick). Added MOTION to Strike on 8/10/2023 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 9 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Briefing Schedule Tue 06/27 2:26 PM
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Joint by MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, BRIAN EARHART, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/27 6:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, it is ORDERED that defendants' Rule 12 motion is due August 10, 2023, plaintiffs' opposition is due September 11, 2023, and defendants' reply is due October 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/27/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
11 11 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 06/23 11:13 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARLYLE GROUP, INC. (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 06/23 11:11 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/23 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Corey John Hauser on behalf of MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, BRIAN EARHART, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE (Hauser, Corey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/23 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter N. Peterson on behalf of MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, BRIAN EARHART, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE (Peterson, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/23 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick L. Thomas on behalf of MICHAEL BROGAN, CARLYLE GROUP, INC., KEVIN CODY, MUGE CODY, BONNIE COOK, BRIAN EARHART, MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION, KATHRYN ROMANCE (Thomas, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 04/17 9:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until seven days after the Court rules on the dispositive motion pending in Hawkins v. ManTech International Corp., Case No. 15-cv-02105, at which time the parties must submit a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/17/23. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
6 6 motion Stay Thu 04/13 1:55 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Disposition of ManTech International Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint pending in the Related Case United States ex rel. Hawkins et al v. ManTech International Corporation et al., Case No. 15-cv-02105 by MICHAEL ABERNATHY, CEDRICK ARTHUR, LARRY BESS, DARIUS CAIN, MARCUS CARTER, MARIO CAVAZOS, MIKE COWLEY, BONITA CROMARTIE, VERNON DASHER, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, MICHAEL GASTON, DELONTE GREEN, JEROME GREENE, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, KYLE KENDRICK, FRANK LAMBEY, JUSTIN LOGAN, ALTON MCNEIL, ERIC NELSON, MICHAEL NOMURA, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, EDWARD PONDER, YUMUL TRISTAN, TAMECIA TURNER, JEFFERY WILLIS.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LCvR 7 (m) Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Tue 02/28 8:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service by The Carlyle Group,
Att: 2 Exhibit Waiver of Service by ManTech International Corp.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Waiver of Service by ManTech Telecom,
Att: 4 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Michael Brogan,
Att: 5 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Bonnie Cook,
Att: 6 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Kevin Cody,
Att: 7 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Muge Cody,
Att: 8 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Kathyrn Romance,
Att: 9 Exhibit Waiver of Service by Brian Earhart
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Tue 02/21 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re3 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MICHAEL BROGAN waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; CARLYLE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; KEVIN CODY waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MUGE CODY waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; BONNIE COOK waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; BRIAN EARHART waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; KATHRYN ROMANCE waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023.(Hennessey, Joseph). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/28/2023. (zbaj)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Mon 02/20 2:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. MICHAEL BROGAN waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; CARLYLE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; KEVIN CODY waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MUGE CODY waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; BONNIE COOK waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; BRIAN EARHART waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; MANTECH TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023; KATHRYN ROMANCE waiver sent on 2/15/2023, answer due 4/16/2023.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit The Carlyle Group, Inc. Waiver of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit ManTech International Waiver of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit ManTech Telecomm and Info Sys Corp. Waiver of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Michael Brogan Waiver of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit Bonnie Cook Waiver of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit Kevin Cody Waiver of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit Muge Cody Waiver of Service,
Att: 8 Exhibit Kathyrn Romance Waiver of Service,
Att: 9 Exhibit Brian Earhart Waiver of Service
Thursday, December 01, 2022
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 12/01 11:00 AM
SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants.(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/01 10:49 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
1 1 85 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/30 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT for Violation of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9701729) filed by FRANK LAMBEY, MIKE COWLEY, EDWARD PONDER, KYLE KENDRICK, CEDRICK ARTHUR, MICHAEL ABERNATHY, JUSTIN LOGAN, RYAN JAKUBOWSKI, TAMECIA TURNER, JOSEAN ORTIZ-MEDINA, JEFFERY WILLIS, LADARIUS PHILLIPS, JEROME GREENE, MICHAEL NOMURA, MISAEL DIAZ, JASON FOSTER, LAWRENCE FREEMAN, DELONTE GREEN, ERIC NELSON, YUMUL TRISTAN, MARIO CAVAZOS, LARRY BESS, VERNON DASHER, MICHAEL GASTON, CHRISTOPHER JACOBS, BONNIE CROMARTIE, DARIUS CAIN, ALTON MCNEIL, MARCUS CARTER.(Hennessey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons The Carlyle Group, Inc.,
Att: 3 Summons ManTech International Corporation,
Att: 4 Summons ManTech Telecommunications,
Att: 5 Summons Michael Brogan,
Att: 6 Summons Bonnie Cook,
Att: 7 Summons Mark Croll,
Att: 8 Summons Brian Earhart,
Att: 9 Summons John Guarnieri,
Att: 10 Summons Kevin Cody,
Att: 11 Summons Muge Cody,
Att: 12 Summons Kathryn Romance