Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:21-bk-22108

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:22-ap-07048
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Williamsburg Hotel BK, LLC
Represented By
The Williamsburg Hotel BK, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Toby Moskovits
Represented By
Toby Moskovits
contact info
Defendant
Michael Lichtenstein
Represented By
Michael Lichtenstein
contact info
Defendant
Heritage Equity Partners
Represented By
Heritage Equity Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen S. Gray, Not Individually But Solely In His Capacity as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Estate of 96 Wythe Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
Neil Matthew Berger
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info

GPO May 07 2025
Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 5/7/2025, Re: Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment (related document(s)10) (Ebanks, Liza)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
51 51 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 05/14 12:47 PM
Notice of Proposed Order /(Presentment Date: May 19, 2025 at 12:00 p.m.; Objection Deadline: May 19, 2025 at 11:00 a.m.) Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Approving Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachment: Ex. A: Proposed Order) Related [+] filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Stephen S. Gray, Not Individually But Solely In His Capacity as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Estate of 96 Wythe Acquisition, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/19/2025 (check with court for location) Objections due by 5/19/2025, (Oswald, Frank)
Related: [-] 10 ,50
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
50 50 28 pgs order Written Opinion Wed 05/07 3:49 PM
Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 5/7/2025, Re: Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 10