Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10388

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:22-ap-00191
Nature of Suit61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2022
Terminated:Apr 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
THOMAS JAMES LYONS, Defendant
9 S 122 FRONTAGE RD. Building 28, Apt. 203
Willowbrook, IL 60527
Represented By
THOMAS JAMES LYONS
contact info
Plaintiff
Sullivan, Taylor, Gumina & Palmer PC, Plaintiff
Represented By
Gina B Krol, ESQ
Cohen & Krol
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Monday, April 01, 2024
93 93 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/01 2:20 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-191 Closed . (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
92 92 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/01 9:24 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. Signed on 3/29/2024. (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-] 85
91 91 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 03/29 1:20 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 04/23/2024 Stricken Related [+]. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
90 90 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 03/29 1:19 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 4/4/2024 Stricken Related [+]. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
89 89 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 03/29 7:36 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Entered in Error Related [+]. (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 87 Order District Court re: Appeal
Thursday, March 28, 2024
88 88 order District Court re: Appeal Fri 03/29 7:25 AM
Order By District Court Judge Harry D. Leinenweber, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 23 cv 5916, Dated March 27, 2024. MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: For all of the reasons stated in Appellee's Motion to Dismiss7 , as well as Appellee's Objections to Appellant'sappeal13 , Appellee's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED7 . As covered in the referenced materials, Appellant has failed to comply with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, failed to comply with the bankruptcy court's proceedings, and has continued to waste judicial resources and his own resources, incurring two previous sanctions for ignoring the presiding bankruptcy judge's orders. Appellant also took over 3 months to comply with Local Rule 83.16 after the Court Clerk's reminder that an attorney must make an appearance2 12 . And Appellant again chooses to waste judicial resources bycontacting chambers to rush a result on this matter, of which any purported delay is due to Appellant's own failure to diligently prosecute his claim, as his reply to Appellee's motion14 was also late. This is unacceptable. Rule 11(b)(1) forbids litigants and their counsel from using the court system for "any improper purpose, such as to harass, causeunnecessary delay, or needlessly increase the cost of litigation,&qu;ot; among other prohibitions on conduct that Appellant and his counsel have arguably violated. The Court will not entertain any further delay. Appellant's appeal is DISMISSED. Related [+]. Signed on 3/28/2024 (Sims, Lakeysha)
Related: [-] 43 Notice of Appeal
87 87 order District Court re: Appeal Thu 03/28 4:21 PM
Entered in Error Order By District Court Judge Harry D. Leinenweber, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 23-cv-05916, Dated 03/27/2024. Appellant's appeal is DISMISSED Related [+]. Signed on 3/28/2024 (Bouchard, Sarah) Modified on 3/29/2024 (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 39 Notice of Appeal with Motion for Leave to Appeal,42 Amended Notice of Appeal,43 Notice of Appeal