Phillips v. Rocha et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02181 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Paula Brotherton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip Hensley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Maddox
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Myers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leon Philpot
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Carlos Rocha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alana S. Phillips
3461 Highway 8 E
Mena, AR 71953 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 04/02 9:29 AM
MANDATE of USCA After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed as modified in accordance with the opinion of this Court to49 Notice of Appeal filed by Alana S. Phillips(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 8USCA judgment, | ||
Att: 2 8USCA opinion |