Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:22-cv-00465
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:May 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By
Chad Carlton Rook
Flowers Davis Pllc - Tyler
contact info
Defendant
Kayla Smith
Defendant
Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith
Represented By
Chad Carlton Rook
Flowers Davis Pllc - Tyler
contact info
Defendant
J. Hospitality LLC
Represented By
Chad Carlton Rook
Flowers Davis Pllc - Tyler
contact info
Defendant
Paresh Patel
Represented By
Chad Carlton Rook
Flowers Davis Pllc - Tyler
contact info
Plaintiff
Masika Brown Ray
312 Meadowlark Lane
Longview, TX 75603


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 12, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/12 8:09 AM
ORDER granting29 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims and causes of action asserted by and between Plaintiff and Defendants in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/11/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/08 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Paresh Patel, Kayla Smith.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 04/25 10:04 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Stay All Deadlines & Settlement Conference on 4/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/25/2023. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/20 9:24 AM
NOTICE the Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/23 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (bga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
27 27 motion Stay Settlement Tue 04/18 12:50 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines & Settlement Conference on 4/24/2023 , Interim MOTION for Settlement (Notice) by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Paresh Patel, Kayla Smith.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/18 10:18 AM
***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Paresh Patel, Kayla Smith (Rook, Chad) Modified on 4/18/2023 (ch, ).
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Correction Tue 04/18 11:15 AM
***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO REFILE AS A MOTION TO STAY AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Document # 26, Notice of Settlement. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/01 2:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. . (Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/22 1:10 PM
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS 3rd MOTION TO DISMISS;MOTION IN SUPPORT OF HER AMENDED COMPLAIN ANDSUBMISSION TO SEE CONSEQUENTIAL/EQUITABLE REMEDIES, re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Masika Brown Ray .(ch, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope(s)
Monday, February 13, 2023
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/13 9:19 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint Subject to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc..(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 02/13 9:18 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc..(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/07 9:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masika Brown Ray. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. Registered agent served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 02/07 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 2/7/2023. A subsequent scheduling conference will be scheduled in April to give Plaintiff ample time to obtain counsel. from 8:57 am-9:17 am Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Masika Ray Pro se; Defense - Chad Rook. (No exhibits)(Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (bga)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/07 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 13 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 01/24 1:51 PM
PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS LATEST PLEADING; MOTION IN SUPPORT OF HER AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUBMISSION TO SEEK CONSEQUENTIAL/EQUITABLE REMEDIES filed by Masika Brown Ray . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/23 12:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Second Motion to Dismiss) filed by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Paresh Patel . (Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
18 18 1 pgs service Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 01/17 1:38 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Masika Brown Ray as to13 Notice of Scheduling Order 1/13/2023 (ch, )
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 01/17 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Marriott International Inc Related [+] (ch, ) Modified on 1/17/2023 (ch, ).
Related: [-] gistered Agent
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/17 9:56 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Motion in Support of Her Amended Complaint and Submission to Seek Consequential/Equitable Remedies filed by Masika Brown Ray . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/13 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masika Brown Ray. J. Hospitality LLC served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/13 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masika Brown Ray. Paresh Patel served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
13 13 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/12 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/11/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
12 12 10 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/11 10:50 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint Subject to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Paresh Patel.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
11 11 14 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 01/11 10:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Paresh Patel.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 12/28 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Paresh Patel. (ch, )
Related: [-]
9 9 14 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/28 1:38 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith, J. Hospitality LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Paresh Patel, filed by Masika Brown Ray.(ch, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit
8 8 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/28 1:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Masika Brown Ray . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 12/21 8:02 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
7 7 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/20 3:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , Subject to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
6 6 12 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 12/20 3:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Courtyard Longview North through its manager, Kayla Smith.(Rook, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 12, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/12 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masika Brown Ray. Kayla Smith served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022. (ch, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/12 1:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masika Brown Ray. Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 12/07 5:03 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 6-62678 (jbe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 12/01 8:23 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Kayla Smith.(nkl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Kayla Smith
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/30 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Kayla Smith, filed by Masika Brown Ray.(ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 11/30 3:15 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]