California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:22-cv-08712
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2023 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Judd A Gilefsky
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Jeck Dizon
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Atir Dadon
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Aaron Cohen
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emili Ester Dadon
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Aaron Cohen
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 01, 2023
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/01 1:06 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. As a result of Plaintiff's violation of the Order Setting Scheduling Conference, this action is dismissed without prejudice. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
18 18 order Leave to Appear Mon 04/24 4:47 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The parties may not evade the requirements for noticed motions and Ex Parte Applications simply by labeling its filings as "Requests." Any future "Request" filed by either party will be summarily denied. Notwithstanding the parties failure to comply with the Local Rules of this Court, the both counsel may appear by Zoom. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS).; granting16 REQUEST for Leave of Allen Amarkarian, Esq. to Appear for Remote Appearance; granting17 REQUEST for Leave of Jeck Dizon to Appear for Remote. (aco)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Mon 04/24 1:04 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Jeck Dizon to Appear for Remote filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Request set for hearing on 5/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Dizon, Jeck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defense Counsel's Request to Appear Remotely For The Scheduling Conference
16 16 motion Appear Mon 04/24 9:51 AM
REQUEST for Leave of Allen Amarkarian, Esq. to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by plaintiff Atir Dadon, Emili Ester Dadon. Request set for hearing on 5/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear Remotely
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 04/18 9:38 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [Amended] ; estimated length of trial approximately 7 days, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Dizon, Jeck)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 04/17 7:17 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial approximately 7 court days, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Dizon, Jeck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 03/21 10:46 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for May 1, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/21 10:38 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 03/20 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-08712 PA(PVCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/03 7:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Dizon, Jeck)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/03 6:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Jeck Dizon added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Dizon, Jeck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
8 8 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Tue 12/13 3:17 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/05 5:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Emili Ester Dadon, Atir Dadon. upon All Parties. Waiver of Service signed by Jeck Dizon, Esq..(Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons
Thursday, December 01, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/01 2:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 12/01 1:57 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/30 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Atir Dadon, Emili Ester Dadon. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/30 4:39 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Atir Dadon, Emili Ester Dadon, (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 11/30 4:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Atir Dadon, Emili Ester Dadon. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/30 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34402192 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Emili Ester Dadon, Atir Dadon. (Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Atir Dadon(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Emili Ester Dadon(pty:pla))(Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A