Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:22-cv-04787
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2022
Terminated:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2023 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
KATHLEEN BAUSMAN
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19130
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAJORKAS
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
TONY BRYSON
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19104
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
MERRICK GARLAND
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
JACQUELINE C ROMERO
IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS UNITED STATES ATTORNEY USAO EDPA 615 Chestnut Street Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106
Represented By
ELIZABETH L. COYNE
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
ZHAN ARSLANYAN
Represented By
STEVEN SAHAG VOSBIKIAN
Vosbikian & Vosbikian
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/21 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZHAN ARSLANYAN (VOSBIKIAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 01/30 8:33 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 4/10/23; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/23. 1/30/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/27 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH L. COYNE on behalf of KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ANTONY BLINKEN, TONY BRYSON, MERRICK GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAJORKAS, JACQUELINE C ROMERO with Certificate of Service(COYNE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
4 4 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Tue 12/13 1:26 PM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 12/05 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ANTONY BLINKEN, TONY BRYSON, MERRICK GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAJORKAS, JACQUELINE C ROMERO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 12/5/22 (amas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2022
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Sun 12/04 3:31 PM
NOTICE by ZHAN ARSLANYAN (VOSBIKIAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
misc Attorney Required Forms Fri 12/02 4:57 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box is not checked off. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 12/01 7:35 PM
COMPLAINT against KATHLEEN BAUSMAN, ANTONY BLINKEN, TONY BRYSON, MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAJORKAS, JACQUELINE C ROMERO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16346496.), filed by ZHAN ARSLANYAN.(VOSBIKIAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit