Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00383
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Dec 01, 2022 11:48 PM PST
Defendant
Daniela Andrea Zanetta (1)
Represented By
Robert Hamilton
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul T. Maloney
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/18/2023 1:14 AM PDT
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
7 7 Redacted Complaint and Affidavit in Support . Pursuant to 6 Order on Motion to Partially Unseal Case as to Defendant Daniela Andrea Zanetta. (sb) [3:22-mj-00180]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
17 17 Sealed Indictment Related [+] as to Daniela Andrea Zanetta (1). COUNT 1: Possession with Intent to Distribute Fentanyl. (kgc)
Related: [-] dacted
18 18 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Daniela Andrea Zanetta. (kgc)
Related: [-]
20 20 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (kgc)
Related: [-]