Original Case: 2:21-cv-06888

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-56122
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2023 12:24 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
MCCANDLESS GROUP, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By
Marina V. Bogorad
Gerard Fox Law, PC
contact info
Gerard P. Fox
Law Offices of Gerard Fox, Inc.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS MCCANDLESS, an individual
Represented By
Marina V. Bogorad
Gerard Fox Law, PC
contact info
Gerard P. Fox
Law Offices of Gerard Fox, Inc.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DOES, 1-10
Plaintiff - Appellant
DIGITAL MARKETING ADVISORS, a California corporation
Represented By
Chris Zhen
Zhen Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Heerde
Heerde Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/14/2023 12:22 AM PST
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Digital Marketing Advisors Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/07/2022. Appellant Digital Marketing Advisors opening brief due 01/27/2023. Appellees Does, Nicholas McCandless and McCandless Group, LLC answering brief due 02/27/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12599440] (JBS) [Entered: 11/30/2022 03:44 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet