Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:22-cv-04777
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2023 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Defendant
PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER
Defendant
PAUL PENZONE
Defendant
PADILLA, REBECCA
Defendant
OROARK, PATRICIA
Defendant
Not Named Graham Estate
Defendant
NARBAEZ, ROMAN
Defendant
MITCHELL, RACHEL H
Defendant
MITCHELL, CHELSEA
Defendant
MCDERMOTT, THOMAS
Defendant
MCCARTHY, BARBARA
Defendant
PRATER, J
Defendant
DONNA MARTIN
Defendant
LUNDFELT, GEOFF
Defendant
LUMLEY, I
Defendant
DEBRA LUCAS
Defendant
LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE
Defendant
LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE
Defendant
MARK LAMB
Defendant
KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE
Defendant
KADISHA, NEIL
Defendant
GRANT MURRAY SNOW
Defendant
ZUCKERBERG, MARK
Defendant
YELLEN, JANET LOUISE
Defendant
WILLIAMS, JERI.L
Defendant
JASIMINE K. WARD
Defendant
VNGUIEN, LIZ
Defendant
TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR
Defendant
TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE
Defendant
TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III
Defendant
STRINGER, SCOTT M
Defendant
JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE
Defendant
SAUL, ANDREW
Defendant
RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE
Defendant
ROSADO, ROSSANA
Defendant
ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL
Defendant
ROBERTS, ANN
Defendant
RICHER,STEPHEN
Defendant
CHARLES PAUL RETTIG
Defendant
RAY, JORDAN
Defendant
RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT
Defendant
JOHNSON, LISA MUTH
Defendant
BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE
Defendant
WILLER, BLAKE
Defendant
VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE
Defendant
STAGGS, BRUCE
Defendant
RIGGS, TAMMY
Defendant
PAGANETTI, BILL
Defendant
ONEILL, SHELLY
Defendant
MILLER, KIMBERLY
Defendant
LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL
Defendant
BLINKEN, ANTONY
Defendant
HOCHUL, KATHY
Defendant
FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE
Defendant
CHEUVRONT, KEN
Defendant
WATTS, DONALD
Defendant
ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR
Defendant
CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE
Defendant
CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE
Defendant
BEGAY, DEBORAH
Defendant
ALTNEU, MATTHEW
Defendant
GARLAND, MERRICK
Defendant
JOHNSON, TANNER
Defendant
JOHNSON, JANET
Defendant
JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE
Defendant
JAMES, LETITIA
Defendant
ANDREW M. HULL
Defendant
BRENT A HAYMORE
Defendant
DEBRA ANN HAALAND
Defendant
GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM
Defendant
GOODAY, HENRY JR
Defendant
BRNOVICH, MARK
Defendant
EISELE, BRETT
Defendant
LOUIS DeJOY
Defendant
DRIGGS, LEONORE
Defendant
DRAKULICH, GENE
Defendant
DINAPOLI, THOMAS
Defendant
COOK,EDDIE
Defendant
COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE
Defendant
CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE
Defendant
BRUTINEL, ROBERT
Plaintiff
RONNIE RAMAEL TODD
SUITE 110
RENO, NV 89502


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/12 2:42 PM
ORDER THAT RONNIE RAMAEL TODD'S CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/12/23. 4/12/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/16 9:51 AM
ORDER THAT IF TODD SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1)PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF TODD FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/16/23. 3/16/23 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
12 12 appeal USCA Order Tue 02/07 11:22 AM
ORDER of USCA THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY PROSECUTE INSOFAR AS APPELLANT FAILED TO PAY THE REQUISITE FEE AS DIRECTED. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS ORDER BE ISSUED IN LIEU OF A FORMAL MANDATE;ETC. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
11 11 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Tue 12/27 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. USCA Case Number 22-3366 (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/23 8:42 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/22/22. 12/23/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/20 4:17 PM
RONNIE RAMAEL TODD PROOF OF CONSIDERATION FOR NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EMAIL
8 8 59 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/20 1:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD.(JL) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/20/2022) (jl). (jl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/20/2022) EMAIL
Monday, December 19, 2022
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/19 11:41 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-MAIL
Thursday, December 15, 2022
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/16 7:59 AM
PROOF OF CONSIDERATION by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EMAIL
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/15 9:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD.(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EMAIL
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
4 4 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Wed 12/14 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to3 Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5,, by RONNIE RAMAEL TODD. (NO IFP GRANTED, NO FEE PAID)(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EMAIL
Monday, December 12, 2022
3 3 order Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5 Tue 12/13 6:49 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/12/22. 12/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 12/02 2:15 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (JL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/02 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against ALTNEU, MATTHEW, BEGAY, DEBORAH, CARMEL LOLA DUERSON ESTATE, CHRYSTIANA MYEA DUERSON ESTATE, ROSCOE, DOUGLAS ANTHONY JR, WATTS, DONALD, CHEUVRONT, KEN, FUENTES LOMELI, LESLIE, HOCHUL, KATHY, JOHNSON, LISA MUTH, LOGAN, STEVEN PAUL, MILLER, KIMBERLY, ONEILL, SHELLY, PAGANETTI, BILL, RIGGS, TAMMY, STAGGS, BRUCE, VINCENT ANTHONY DUVAL JR ESTATE, WILLER, BLAKE, BIDEN, JOSEPH ROBINETTE, BLINKEN, ANTONY, BRNOVICH, MARK, BRUTINEL, ROBERT, CHRISTINE RIDLEY ESTATE, COLANDA MARIE DUERSON ESTATE, COOK,EDDIE, DINAPOLI, THOMAS, DRAKULICH, GENE, DRIGGS, LEONORE, LOUIS DeJOY, EISELE, BRETT, GARLAND, MERRICK, GOODAY, HENRY JR, GRAHAM, LACE MONIQUE LACE MONIQUE GRAHAM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, BRENT A HAYMORE, ANDREW M. HULL, JAMES, LETITIA, JEROME BLACKWELL ESTATE, JOHNSON, JANET, JOHNSON, TANNER, JOSEPH ATTAWAY ESTATE, KADISHA, NEIL, KENNETH SHAUN TODD ESTATE, MARK LAMB, LAND RAMARI EL ESTATE, LILA RAMAYA EL ESTATE, DEBRA LUCAS, LUMLEY, I, LUNDFELT, GEOFF, DONNA MARTIN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MCCARTHY, BARBARA, MCDERMOTT, THOMAS, MITCHELL, CHELSEA, MITCHELL, RACHEL H, NARBAEZ, ROMAN, Not Named Graham Estate, OROARK, PATRICIA, PADILLA, REBECCA, PAUL PENZONE, PHOENIX POLICE OFFICER, PRATER, J, RAMAEL BLACKWELL EL ESTAT, RAY, JORDAN, CHARLES PAUL RETTIG, RICHER,STEPHEN, ROBERTS, ANN, ROONEY TODD ESTATE ET AL, ROSADO, ROSSANA, RYAN RAMAEL TODD ESTATE, SAUL, ANDREW, GRANT MURRAY SNOW, STRINGER, SCOTT M, TAYLOR, BRACLE DON III, TERRANCE JOHNSON ESTATE, TINGLING, MILTON ADAIR, VNGUIEN, LIZ, JASIMINE K. WARD, WILLIAMS, JERI.L, YELLEN, JANET LOUISE, ZUCKERBERG, MARK, filed by RONNIE RAMEAL TODD. (NO FEE PAID, NO IFP MOTION)(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1,
Att: 2 2,
Att: 3 3,
Att: 4 4