Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:22-cv-02049
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2022
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2022-013716
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2023 2:34 AM MST
Defendant
Critter Control Operations Incorporated
Represented By
Shayna Balch Santiago
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Nermana Grinnan
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Rollins Incorporated
Represented By
Shayna Balch Santiago
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Nermana Grinnan
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Jon Evans
Represented By
Isaac Pasaret Hernandez
Hernandez Law Firm PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rebecca Dye
Terminated: 05/19/2023
Defendant
France Khosravi
Terminated: 05/19/2023


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
197 197 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 05/13 4:04 PM
ORDER granting196 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may have until Friday, May 30, 2025 to file a consolidated Reply. FURTHER ORDERED continuing oral argument from May 15, 2025 to June 5, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/25. (MAP)
Related: [-]
196 196 motion Reconsideration (Sealed) Tue 05/13 3:59 PM
SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of Defendants' Motion to Extend Defendants' Reply Deadlines in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment at Docs.167 and168 (Doc.189 ) by Jeff Campbell, Critter Control Operations Incorporated, Rebecca Dye, Rollins Incorporated. (MAP)
Related: [-]
195 195 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 05/13 3:55 PM
ORDER granting193 Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office file under seal Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Motion to Extend Defendants' Reply Deadlines in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment at Docs.167 and168 (Doc.189 ) lodged on May 13, 2025. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/25. (MAP)
Related: [-]
194 194 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF) Tue 05/13 3:15 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Motion to Extend Defendants' Reply Deadlines in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment re:193 MOTION to Seal Document192 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,190 Notice of Errata, . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Jeff Campbell, Critter Control Operations Incorporated, Rebecca Dye, Rollins Incorporated. (Santiago, Shayna)
Related: [-]
193 193 motion Seal Document Tue 05/13 3:13 PM
MOTION to Seal Document192 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,190 Notice of Errata, by Jeff Campbell, Critter Control Operations Incorporated, Rebecca Dye, Rollins Incorporated.(Santiago, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
192 192 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/13 12:00 PM
ORDER denying189 Defendants' Motion to Extend Defendants' Reply Deadlines in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment at Docs.167 and168 ; Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Defendants' Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming oral argument on Defendant Critter Control Operations, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Thursday May 15, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the other two pending Motions for Summary Judgment are deemed submitted on the existing briefs. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton on 5/13/2025. (KMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
191 191 misc Reply Mon 05/12 4:36 PM
REPLY re:165 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Brief In Support of Defendant Khosravi's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant France Khosravi. (Morrow, Andrew)
Related: [-]
190 190 misc Notice of Errata Mon 05/12 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:189 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to178 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Jeff Campbell, Critter Control Operations Incorporated, Rebecca Dye, Rollins Incorporated..(Santiago, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 09, 2025
189 189 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/09 8:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to178 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Jeff Campbell, Critter Control Operations Incorporated, Rebecca Dye, Rollins Incorporated.(Santiago, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
188 188 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Wed 05/07 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Shayna Balch Santiago. (Santiago, Shayna)
Related: [-]