Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Case #: 3:22-cv-01601
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2023 5:57 AM AST
Defendant
US Postal Service
Represented By
Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Puerto Rico
contact info
Plaintiff
Joarys Santos
Represented By
Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Cobo Estrella Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM AST
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Thu 03/14 11:11 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs case pursuant to this Court's Opinion and Order, Docket No.19 . Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/14/2024.(ABG)
Related: [-]
19 19 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/14 11:06 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/14/2024. (ABG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
18 18 order Order on Informative Motion Wed 03/13 12:16 PM
ORDER noted16 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/13/2024. (ABG)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/18 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Out of Office from December 26, 2023 to January 7, 2024 by US Postal Service (Bhatia-Gautier, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
16 16 motion Informative Motion Fri 12/08 3:49 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Unavailability of Defendant's Counsel due to "Use or Lose" Annual Leave filed by Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman on behalf of US Postal Service Responses due by 12/22/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/12 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Out of the Office by US Postal Service (Bhatia-Gautier, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/06 10:05 AM
NOTICE (Out of Office) by US Postal Service (Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
13 13 respm Reply to Motion Thu 05/11 3:50 PM
REPLY to Motion filed by US Postal Service Re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Postal Service filed by US Postal Service. (Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/11 2:41 PM
ORDER granting11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition; granting MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Reply shall be filed in separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/11/2023. (ABO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
11 11 motion Leave to File Document File Excess Pages Thu 05/04 5:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition (ECF No. 10) , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/18/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Reply Brief
Friday, April 28, 2023
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Fri 04/28 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:9 Memorandum in Opposition. ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate. Document Re-filed in D.E. # 10 *** (gav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 14 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Thu 04/27 1:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition Duplicate (with complete Signature Block) filed by All Plaintiffs Re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Postal Service filed by All Plaintiffs.(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Documents in Support of Opposition
9 9 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Thu 04/27 1:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to unsupported Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Postal Service filed by All Plaintiffs.(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Documents in Support of Opposition
Monday, April 17, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 04/17 1:23 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/17/2023. (ABO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
7 7 motion File Excess Pages Fri 04/14 9:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/14 9:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/28/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEO Counselor Form
Monday, January 30, 2023
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/30 4:11 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, filed by US Postal Service. Answer deadline due by 4/14/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/30/2023. (su)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/30 1:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until April 14th, 2023 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re:1 Complaint, filed by Joarys Santos filed by Priscila M. Acevedo-Roman on behalf of US Postal Service Responses due by 2/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Acevedo-Roman, Priscila)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, December 05, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/05 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to US Postal Service. (vdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 12/05 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (vdm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 12/03 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8011116.), filed by Joarys Santos. Service due by 3/3/2023,(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons USPS,
Att: 4 Summons Summons US Att Gen,
Att: 5 Summons Summons US Att PR Office