Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:22-cv-04920
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2023 5:51 AM CDT
Defendant
USAA General Indemnity Company
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Burnegene Frederick
Represented By
Claude Favrot Reynaud, III
contact info
Grant P. Gardiner
Law Office Of Bruce C. Betzer
contact info
Cameron Sean Snowden
contact info
R. William Huye, III
Mcclenny Moseley & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
28 28 21 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 11:51 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/18 4:30 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/18/2024.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss Thu 03/14 2:26 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss by USAA General Indemnity Company.Attorney Brian Michael LeCompte added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(LeCompte, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
25 25 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/13 11:29 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/23 8:55 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company.Attorney Angelina Christina added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Christina, Angelina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
23 23 misc ADI event Thu 10/05 8:43 AM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
22 22 30+ pgs order Order Tue 09/26 4:17 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
21 21 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/14 12:21 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/24 5:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to USAA General Indemnity Company on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Fajoni, Rachael)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Thu 08/24 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. (mmv)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 08/24 10:04 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re16 Request for Summons Issued. **1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is SUMMONS SUBMITTED FOR ISSUANCE. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2) Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the SUMMONS. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mmv)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 08/24 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Rachael Fajoni (La. Bar No. 38210) shall be enrolled as additional counsel of record for plaintiff, Burnegene Frederick. Attorney Samuel Joseph Bua, II terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/24/23. (fml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
16 16 service Request for Summons Issued Wed 08/23 10:24 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company filed by Burnegene Frederick re1 Complaint,. (Fajoni, Rachael) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/23/2023) (mmv)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 08/23 10:01 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Rachael Fajoni to be substituted in place of Samuel Bua by Burnegene Frederick.Attorney Rachael Margaret Fajoni added to party Burnegene Frederick(pty:pla).(Fajoni, Rachael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 11, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 08/11 2:07 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the stay in the above-captioned lawsuit is LIFTED for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Counsel Without Prior Attorney's Signature Related [+] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this lawsuit be returned to the Streamlined Settlement Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should the law firm McClenny, Moseley & Associates seek to make any claim or enforce any lien for attorneys' fees against Plaintiff's recovery in this case, notice of that lien and/or a petition for intervention shall be filed in the record no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/10/23.(cg)(cc: Francis Lobrano and William Gibbens)
Related: [-] c. doc.13
Att: 1 Addendum to CMO
Thursday, August 10, 2023
13 13 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Thu 08/10 10:49 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Counsel Without Prior Attorney's Signature by Burnegene Frederick. Motion(s) referred to Michael North.Attorney Samuel Joseph Bua, II added to party Burnegene Frederick(pty:pla).(Bua, Samuel) Modified text on 8/10/2023 (mmv). (NEF: MJ North, Case Mgr.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Burnegene Frederick - Executed Contract
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Wed 07/05 4:18 PM
Letter to Burnegene Frederick from Court re: Representation dated 6/30/2023. (cs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
11 11 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 06/06 10:45 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cameron Sean Snowden; Grant P. Gardiner and Claude Favrot Reynaud, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 05/23/2023. (go)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 06/06 10:44 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Grant P. Gardiner, Claude F. Reynaud, III, Cameron S. Snowden as Attorney by Burnegene Frederick. (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
9 9 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/13 4:35 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney R. William Huye, III terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/30/2023. (nml)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/13 4:22 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw R. William Huye III as Attorney by Burnegene Frederick.(nml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 06, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/06 9:14 AM
ORDER staying all cases in which McClenny, Moseley & Associates is enrolled as counsel of record and setting MMA's deadline for filing notice of lien and/or petition of intervention for attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/03/2023.(my)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
6 6 21 pgs order Order Mon 03/20 10:36 AM
AMENDED ORDER STAYING CASES Filed by McClenny, Moseley & Associates. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 03/16/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
5 5 21 pgs order Order Wed 03/08 11:27 AM
ORDER STAYING CASES Filed by McClenny, Moseley & Associates with updated Attachment B. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 03/02/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
4 4 27 pgs order Order Tue 12/06 7:43 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENTORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(cg)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/06 7:42 PM
Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. (cg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 12/05 1:51 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2022
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 12/04 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9682731) filed by Burnegene Frederick.Attorney Claude Favrot Reynaud, III added to party Burnegene Frederick(pty:pla) Related [+]
Related: [-] ynaud, Claude
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons