Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:22-cv-40141
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2023 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe 1 through 20
Defendant
Bob Martellio
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rubin
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Frank Tiano
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Town of Uxbridge
21 S. Main Street
Uxbridge, MA 01569
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Uxbridge Public School District
9 N. Main Street
Uxbridge, MA 02569
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Dimeglio
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Darius Silva
336 Crownshield Avenue
Uxbridge, MA 01569
Represented By
Maria F. Deaton
Lynch & Pine, LLC
contact info
Ferenc Karoly, Jr
Lynch & Pine Attorneys At Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Strike [ECF 24] is DENIED and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF 19] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary judgment is GRANTED in full as to Counts I, II and IV. Summary judgment is also GRANTED as to Count III as it relates to Tiano, Rubin, DiMeglio and Martellio, and Count V as it relates to Tiano, Rubin and DiMeglio. Summary judgment is DENIED as to Count III as it relates to the Town and the School District and Count V as it relates to Martellio. SO ORDERED. (SF)

Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/22 11:08 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: Status Conference held on 4/22/2025. Case called. Counsel appear by video for status conference to set trial date. Court and counsel discuss available dates. Court sets Pretrial Conference for 11/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] and sets Jury Trial for 12/8/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (In person only) before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. Procedural Order re pretrial filing dates to issue. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Deaton, Karoly, Mayo) (SF)
Related: [-] mote only
Friday, April 11, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/11 4:56 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact the session [LINK:here] . (SF)
Related: [-] mote only
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 24 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Strike Mon 03/24 4:18 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Strike [ECF 24] is DENIED and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF 19] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary judgment is GRANTED in full as to Counts I, II and IV. Summary judgment is also GRANTED as to Count III as it relates to Tiano, Rubin, DiMeglio and Martellio, and Count V as it relates to Tiano, Rubin and DiMeglio. Summary judgment is DENIED as to Count III as it relates to the Town and the School District and Count V as it relates to Martellio. SO ORDERED. (SF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Fri 01/24 2:58 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling January 31, 2025 Motion Hearing. The Court will decide the motion on the papers. (SF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
26 26 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Wed 12/11 1:02 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion19 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (In person only) before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/22 1:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Strike23 Opposition to Motion,22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Darius Silva. (Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
24 24 motion Strike Wed 07/17 2:56 PM
MOTION to Strike23 Opposition to Motion,22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 07/16 4:38 PM
Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Darius Silva. (Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
22 22 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/16 10:39 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Darius Silva.(Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 to Support PLNTF's Memorandum in Opposition to DEF's Motion for Summary Judgment
Monday, June 17, 2024
21 21 respm Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 Mon 06/17 4:34 PM
Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Darius Silva,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Rubin
20 20 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 06/17 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Dimeglio, John Doe 1 through 20, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District. (Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Mon 06/17 4:30 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
18 18 order Order Canceling Deadline Thu 06/13 8:28 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The Status Conference set for 6/17/2024 is hereby canceled. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 02/12 12:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-] mote only
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 02/12 12:07 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery/Depositions to be completed by 3/22/2024, Plaintiff's trial experts designated by April 19, 2024, Plaintiff's trial experts deposed by May 17, 2024, Defendant's trial experts designated by May 17, 2024, Defendant's trial experts deposed by June 17, 2024, Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2024, (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
15 15 motion Amend Fri 02/09 4:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Reassignment Thu 03/16 4:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Margaret R. Guzman added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/13 1:27 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2023 to Serve Discovery Upon the Defendants. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/13 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ferenc Karoly, Jr on behalf of Darius Silva (Karoly, Ferenc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 03/10 3:52 PM
STIPULATION re 8 Order,,,,, Extending Time for the Plaintiff to Respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Darius Silva. (Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/10 3:46 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2023 to Serve Discovery Upon the Defendants by Darius Silva.(Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
9 9 discov Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 Mon 02/13 1:19 PM
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Darius Silva.(Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
8 8 order Order Fri 01/06 9:35 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendants having filed their Answer, the court enters the following pretrial schedule. Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 2/13/23. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 5/5/23. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed with the opposing counsel within 30 days of the initial disclosures (no later than 3/13/23). If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 7/2/23 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 8/25/23. If dispositive motions are appropriate, they are due by 9/22/23, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 10/13/23; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 7/21/23, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/05 2:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/05 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney E. Mayo on behalf of Michael Dimeglio, Bob Martellio, Michael Rubin, Frank Tiano, Town of Uxbridge, Uxbridge Public School District (Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/19 4:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Uxbridge served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/19 10:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Uxbridge Public School District served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. (Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/06 2:00 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 12/06 1:30 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/05 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number BMADC-9613055 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Darius Silva.(Deaton, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form