White Stallion Energy, LLC v. ARI Properties LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-13037
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-13037
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-50467 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ARI Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
White Stallion Energy, LLC
250 Cross Pointe Boulevard
Evansville, IN 47715 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings Commenced by Above-Captioned Plaintiff Filed by White Stallion Energy, LLC. (Faris, S. Alexander) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 09/20/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Marc C Phillips is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 3/22/2024. Signed on 9/18/2023. (KAR) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order of Reassignment of Judge - Judge Thomas M Horan added to case. Involvement of Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein Terminated (SJS) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by ARI Properties LLC Mediation due date: 07/31/2023.(Mann, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ARI Properties LLC. (Faris, S. Alexander) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 12/05 4:01 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50467 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10927002, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-50467 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 544, 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by White Stallion Energy, LLC against ARI Properties LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/2/2023. (Faris, S. Alexander) |