Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Referred: James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 1:22-cv-02181
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Terminated:Jan 26, 2023
Case in other court:Cleveland Municipal Court, 22 CVG 009756
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2023 6:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Anita Jackson
PO Box 937921
Cleveland, OH 44101
Defendant
Migel Taylor
2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37
Cleveland, OH 44102
Plaintiff
MIMG XXXVI West Tech Lofts, LLC
Represented By
Shawn Thomas Biesiada
Law Offices Of James S. Nowak
contact info
Matthew Turkalj
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info

GPO Jan 18 2023
ation due by 2/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/18/23. (M,MT)Report and Recommendation that 10 Motion to remand case filed by MIMG XXXVI West Tech Lofts, LLC, that this action be remanded to Cleveland Municipal Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Objections to Report & Recommend

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 27, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Remark Fri 01/27 10:13 AM
Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Cleveland Municipal Clerk of Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. Related document(s)15 . (Mc,K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
15 15 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order of Remand Thu 01/26 11:37 AM
Order Adopting12 Report and Recommendation: Due to the lack of subject matter jurisdiction in this case, the Court concurs with the findings in the R&R that this case should be remanded to Cleveland Municipal Court. Thus, the Court ADOPTS the January 18, 2023 R&R, GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to remand, and REMANDS the case back to Cleveland Municipal Court because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. As the Court lacks jurisdiction over this case, it will not make any finding regarding Defendants' two motions to dismiss. (ECF No.11 and14 ). The Court further CERTIFIES that an appeal of this decision cannot be taken in good faith. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/26/2023. (S,SR) (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/26/2023) Corrected order - signed
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 01/26 11:41 AM
Copy of15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation mailed to Migel Taylor at 2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37 Cleveland, OH 44102 and Anita Jackson at PO Box 937921 Cleveland, OH 44101 on 1/26/2023. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
14 14 motion Dismiss Tue 01/24 1:54 PM
Motion to dismiss eviction action with prejudice, filed by Anita Jackson and Migel Taylor.. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - N - Various Documents
13 13 oth_ans Objection to Report and Recommendation Tue 01/24 1:51 PM
Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by Migel Taylor. Related document(s)12 . (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
12 12 order Report and Recommendation Wed 01/18 3:08 PM
Report and Recommendation that10 Motion to remand case filed by MIMG XXXVI West Tech Lofts, LLC, that this action be remanded to Cleveland Municipal Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 2/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/18/23. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 01/18 3:13 PM
Copy of12 Report and Recommendation, mailed to Anita Jackson PO Box 937921 Cleveland, OH 44101, Migel Taylor 2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37 Cleveland, OH 44102, Shawn Thomas Biesiada Law Offices Of James S. Nowak 4808 North Summit St. Toledo, OH 43611. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 01/10 12:32 PM
Motion to dismiss eviction action with prejudice, filed by Anita Jackson, Migel Taylor. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 01/09 3:49 PM
Order . [non-document] The Court ordered Defendants to show cause by December 27, 2022, and gave Plaintiff until January 6, 2023 to submit a responsive filing, Doc.6 . Defendants submitted a timely filing, Doc.7 and8 . Plaintiff responded to Defendants' filing with a motion to remand, Doc.10 . This motion is based on the issue identified in the Courts order to show cause. Because Defendants have had an opportunity to discuss the issue presented in Plaintiff's motion, the Court finds good cause to modify the time Defendants will have to oppose Plaintiffs motion. Defendants may file an opposition no later than Tuesday, January 17, 2023. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/09/23. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 01/09 3:54 PM
Copy of Order, mailed to Anita Jackson PO Box 937921 Cleveland, OH 44101, Migel Taylor 2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37 Cleveland, OH 44102, and Shawn Thomas Biesiada at the Law Offices Of James S. Nowak 4808 North Summit St. Toledo, OH 43611. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
10 10 motion Remand Case (other) Fri 01/06 5:25 PM
Motion to remand case filed by Plaintiff MIMG XXXVI West Tech Lofts, LLC. (Turkalj, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 01/06 5:23 PM
Attorney Appearance by Matthew Turkalj filed by on behalf of MIMG XXXVI West Tech Lofts, LLC. (Turkalj, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
8 8 oth_doc Affidavit/Declaration (court event) Tue 12/27 10:18 AM
Affidavit of U.S. Nationality/Declaration of Status filed by Migel Taylor. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
7 7 oth_doc Affidavit/Declaration (court event) Tue 12/27 10:17 AM
Affidavit of U.S. Nationality/Declaration of Status filed by Anita Jackson. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 15, 2022
oth_evt Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements Thu 12/15 9:37 AM
Notice of Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the[LINK:AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form] by 12/29/2022. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 12/15 9:44 AM
Copy of NEF regarding Trademark and Patent Reporting Requirements mailed to Shawn Thomas Biesiada at Law Offices Of James S. Nowak 4808 North Summit St. Toledo, OH 43611; Migel Taylor at 2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37 Cleveland, OH 44102; and Anita Jackson at PO Box 937921 Cleveland, OH 44101 on 12/15/2022. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 12/13 3:44 PM
Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 12/13/22. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
5 5 oth_evt Returned Mail Tue 12/13 9:23 AM
Returned Mail addressed to Party Anita Jackson. Marked "Return to Sender" with forwarding address. Re-mailed to address listed. Related document(s)4 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Referral Wed 12/07 8:37 AM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. for general pretrial supervision and non-dipositive motions. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/7/2022. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 12/07 8:40 AM
Copy of4 Order of Referral mailed to Migel Taylor, Anita Jackson at 2201 West 93rd Street Unit 37 Cleveland, OH 44102 on 12/7/2022. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 12/05 12:55 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/05 12:54 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Migel Taylor. Related document(s)1 . (R,AP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 12/05 12:44 PM
Notice of Removal from Cleveland Municipal Court, case number 22 CVG 009756. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Anita Jackson and Migel Taylor. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cleveland Municipal Court Complaint Case Number 22 CVG 009756,
Att: 3 Cleveland Municipal Court Docket,
Att: 4 Cleveland Municipal Court Documents
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 12/05 12:50 PM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 12/05 12:51 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (R,AP)
Related: [-]