Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:22-cv-03023
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2023 5:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Mayo Clinic Arizona
Represented By
Katherine Tank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Emily A McNee
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Holly M Robbins
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
George R Wood
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Lehoan T. Pham
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc.
Represented By
Katherine Tank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Emily A McNee
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Holly M Robbins
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
George R Wood
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Lehoan T. Pham
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mayo Clinic, The
Represented By
Katherine Tank
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Emily A McNee
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Holly M Robbins
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Hannah Camilleri Hughes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
George R Wood
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Kathryn Mrkonich Wilson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Lehoan T. Pham
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brigette Brimhall
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorelle Goldsberry
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Heath
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Mauck
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Murphy
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cindy Schmatlz
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
William F Mohrman
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info
Vincent J Fahnlander
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/09 2:51 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint filed by Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The, Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Robbins, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
22 22 service Summons Issued Wed 08/28 11:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Southwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The, Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/26 5:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Cindy Schmatlz, Lorelle Goldsberry, Brandon Mauck, Brigette Brimhall, Brian Heath, Barbara Murphy. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
20 20 12 pgs order Order to Consolidate Cases Mon 07/08 12:10 PM
ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/3/2024.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
19 19 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 7:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants. filed by Cindy Schmatlz, Lorelle Goldsberry, Brandon Mauck, Brigette Brimhall, Brian Heath, Barbara Murphy. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
17 17 minutes Status Conference Fri 06/14 2:46 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/14/2024: Status Conference. Digital Recording Telephone Conference Time: 9:01-9:22 a.m. Total Time: 21 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Gregory Erickson For Defendant(s): Emily McNee; Holly Robbins PROCEEDINGS: The Court held a status conference. The deadline for Defendants to answer in the 32 cases is extended until August 14, 2024. The parties must submit an amended Rule 26(f) report on or before June 28, 2024. The report should address matters such as a partial consolidation (or similar means for streamlining filing), regular status conferences, and proposals for scheduling of summary judgment and trial ready dates. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Tue 04/02 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Bennett, Avery)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/29 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Lanari on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lanari, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Mon 10/30 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (Bennett, Avery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
13 13 minutes Status Conference Tue 09/12 5:19 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2023: Status Conference. The parties jointly requested a stay of the above-captioned cases pending the Eighth Circuits decision in the Representative Cases (Case Nos. 22-cv-1327 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1319 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1405 JRT/ECW, 22-cv-1420 JRT/ECW, and 22-cv-1427 JRT/ECW). Based on the parties representations, and for purposes of judicial and party economy, the Court granted the stay on the record at the hearing. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT the above-captioned cases are STAYED pending the Eighth Circuits decision in the Representative Cases. Further, IT IS ORDERED that within 5 days after that decision, the parties must send an email requesting a status conference with the Court to Cowan_Wright_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov, and that within 21 days after the Eighth Circuits decision, the parties must file a proposed schedule and discovery plan in view of that decision. (TMA)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 09/12 12:59 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Status Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/31 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Tank on behalf of All Defendants. (Tank, Katherine)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Tue 01/31 10:09 AM
ORDER ORDER TO STAY DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/31/2023.(TMA)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Tue 01/31 10:06 AM
FILED IN ERROR, CASE NOT TO BE STAYED.ORDER STAYING CASE- See ORDER for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/31/2023.(TMA) Modified text on 1/31/2023 (TMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
8 8 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 01/27 2:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re7 Stipulation,. (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 01/27 2:42 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. Jointly Signed by Brian Heath, Brandon Mauck, Lorelle Goldsberry, Brigette Brimhall, Barbara Murphy, and Cindy Schmaltz. (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
6 6 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 01/17 11:33 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (McNee, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/07 1:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cindy Schmatlz, Lorelle Goldsberry, Brandon Mauck, Brigette Brimhall, Brian Heath, Barbara Murphy. Mayo Clinic Arizona waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023; Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023; Mayo Clinic, The waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/07 8:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by George R Wood on behalf of All Defendants. (Wood, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/05 12:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System - Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-3023 (JRT/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-] lated Cases-Non-MDL
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/05 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic Arizona, Mayo Clinic Health System Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc., Mayo Clinic, The (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9930881) filed by Cindy Schmatlz, Lorelle Goldsberry, Brandon Mauck, Brigette Brimhall, Brian Heath, Barbara Murphy. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 12/05 12:38 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 22-cv-3023 (JRT/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-] lated Cases-Non-MDL