Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 5:22-cv-04819
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2022
Terminated:May 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2023 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC.
Represented By
JOSHUA L. SCHWARTZ
Barley Snyder LLP
contact info
Caleb P Setlock
Barley Snyder
contact info
Plaintiff
GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER
Represented By
ADAM C. LEASE
Karpf Karpf & Cerutti PC
contact info
Thomas J Nolan, Jr
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
22 22 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/09 10:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement VIDEO Conference held on 5/8/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 05/09 9:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 5/9/2023. 5/9/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/12 1:31 PM
ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/8/2023 01:30 PM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/12/23. 4/12/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Trial Tue 03/28 1:46 PM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR TRIAL TO EXTEND TO EXTEND THE TRIAL POOL ENTRY DATE AND ASSOCIATED PRE-TRIAL DEADINES IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 3/28/23.3/28/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
18 18 motion Trial Mon 03/27 4:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Trial to EXTEND THE TRIAL POOL ENTRY DATE AND ASSOCIATED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES filed by SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC..Certificate of Service.(Setlock, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/27 9:51 AM
NOTICE FROM CHAMBERS OF JUDGE HEY RE: This matter having been referred to Judge Hey for the purposes of conducting settlement proceedings,the following procedures shall apply (see Judge Heys policies and procedures):http://www.paed.uscourts.gov/judges-info/magistrate-judges/elizabeth-t-hey. ETC.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/22 3:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/28/2023 11:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT. DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/19/2023. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 8/21/2023. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/21/2023. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 8/21/2023. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/21/2023. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/21/2023. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/5/2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 3/22/2023. 3/22/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Tue 03/21 2:06 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO JUDGE HEY FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT SUCH TIME AND UNDER SUCH TERMS AS JUDGE HEY MAY DETERMINE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 3/21/23. 3/21/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 03/21 1:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT RULE 16 Conference held on 3/21/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 misc Report Of Mon 03/06 2:05 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference and Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER. (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/28 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/21/2023 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT.(sfl) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/28/2023) (sfl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/22 1:47 PM
ORDER OF 2/22/23 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE WYLESOL ON 2/22/23. 2/22/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/17 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that the above-captioned case is being reassigned to the docket of a newly reporting District Court Judge for all further proceedings. Accordingly, the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned case for Monday, March 6, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (sres)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/23 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb P Setlock on behalf of SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC.(Setlock, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Nolan, Jr on behalf of GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER (Nolan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/23 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Please be advised that an initial pretrial conference has been scheduled before Judge Edward G. Smith in the above-captioned matter for MONDAY, MARCH 6, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be held at the Holmes Building, 101 Larry Holmes Drive, Easton, Pennsylvania 18042. (sres)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 01/23 10:08 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC..(SCHWARTZ, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/23 10:02 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC..(SCHWARTZ, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/04 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER (LEASE, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/06 3:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER. SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/4/2023. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/06 7:48 AM
Summons Issued as to SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/6/22 (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 12/05 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against SWEET STREET DESSERTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16351654.), filed by GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 12/06 7:49 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GLENN MARTIN BAHLINGER. (dt)
Related: [-]