Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-16276

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:22-ap-01157
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2022
Terminated:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
ROWE NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL
10009 MOON VALLEY PLACE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89134
Represented By
ROWE NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL
contact info
Plaintiff
SHELLEY D KROHN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133
Represented By
HOUMAND LAW FIRM, LTD.
contact info
JACOB L. HOUMAND
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info
BRADLEY G SIMS
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
28 28 court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/19 11:53 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (arv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Wed 03/06 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulated/Agreed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
26 26 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Mon 03/04 3:24 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 24 Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC).
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
24 24 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Mon 03/04 1:52 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Friday, March 01, 2024
23 23 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Fri 03/01 11:02 AM
Stipulation By SHELLEY D KROHN and Between Rowe Nelson Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
22 22 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Wed 01/24 10:05 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
21 21 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 01/23 8:47 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Related [+](arv)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, December 21, 2023
20 20 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 12/21 1:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
19 19 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/20 10:45 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/18/2024 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
18 18 notice Hearing (Adv) Tue 12/19 12:19 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 01/18/2024 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
17 17 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Tue 12/19 12:17 PM
Declaration Of: Shelley D. Krohn In Support of Motion to Approve Compromise Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
16 16 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 12/19 12:15 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
15 15 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Wed 09/27 8:27 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Friday, September 22, 2023
14 14 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Fri 09/22 8:29 AM
Stipulation By SHELLEY D KROHN and Between ROWE NELSON Extend Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
13 13 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Fri 07/14 2:12 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Approving Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request) with Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Fri 07/14 1:52 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
11 11 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Wed 07/12 11:57 AM
Stipulation By SHELLEY D KROHN and Between Rowe Nelson TO EXTEND DISCOVERY Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 7 Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 04/27 3:45 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 06/01/2023 09:30 am. Continued. Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by SHELLEY D KROHN
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 04/06 5:20 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 06/01/2023 09:30 pm. Continued to the Correct Time of 9:30 AM . Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by SHELLEY D KROHN
Thursday, March 23, 2023
8 8 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 03/23 4:36 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 03/23/2023 09:30 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: BRADLEY G SIMS, KYLE M. WYANT Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 09:30 PM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by SHELLEY D KROHN
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
7 7 adv_misc Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan Wed 03/22 7:22 PM
Discovery Plan Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/02 4:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by BART K. LARSEN on behalf of ROWE NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL (LARSEN, BART)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 09, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 12/09 4:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on ROWE NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL 12/8/2022 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, December 05, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 12/05 4:25 PM
Summons Issued on ROWE NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL (arv)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Mon 12/05 4:24 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/23/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Friday, December 02, 2022
2 2 cmp Request to Issue Summons Fri 12/02 4:10 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: Rowe Nelson. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/02 4:09 PM
Adversary case 22-01157 Complaint Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN vs. Rowe Nelson Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))(SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]