California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:22-cv-08787
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2022
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:22-cv-03977
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2023 1:54 AM PDT
Defendant
California Attorney Lending II, Inc.
Represented By
William E. Brueckner, III
Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP
contact info
Samantha Yu
Ponist Law Group PC
contact info
William E Brueckner, III
Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP
contact info
William F. Savino
Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP
contact info
Sean E Ponist
Ponist Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Cary McReynolds
Ponist Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Dinardo
Represented By
Richard M Scherer, Jr
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP
contact info
Richard M. Scherer, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Jeff W. Poole
Hamrick And Evans LLP
contact info
Defendant
EJ Global, LLC
Represented By
Evan Christopher Borges
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Amir A Shakoorian Tabrizi
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
David T Shackelford
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erika Girardi
Represented By
Evan Christopher Borges
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Amir A Shakoorian Tabrizi
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
David T Shackelford
Greenberg Gross LLP
contact info
Defendant
Keith Griffin
Represented By
Laura Kelly St Martin
Rosen Saba LLP
contact info
Ryan D Saba
Rosen Saba LLP
contact info
Defendant
George Hatcher
Represented By
Anthony L. Lanza
Lanza And Smith PLC
contact info
Brodie Hugh Smith
Lanza And Smith PLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Kamon
Represented By
Steven D Park
Park Lawless And Tremonti LLP
contact info
Vincent Frank Tremonti, II
Park Lawless And Tremonti LLP
contact info
Damian J Martinez
Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud And Romo
contact info
Defendant
David Lira
Represented By
Rachel Marilyn Lannen
Engstrom Lipscomb And Lack
contact info
Walter John Lack
Engstrom Lipscomb And Lack PC
contact info
Defendant
Wrongful Death Consultants
Represented By
Anthony L. Lanza
Lanza And Smith PLC
contact info
Brodie Hugh Smith
Lanza And Smith PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edelson PC
Represented By
Daniel David McDonough Abraham
Jubilee Legal
contact info
Hannah Hilligoss
Edelson PC
contact info
Alexander G. Tievsky
Edelson PC
contact info
Jay Edelson
Edelson LLC
contact info
J. Eli Wade-Scott
Edelson PC
contact info
Rafey S Balabanian
Edelson PC
contact info
Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Edelson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 18, 2024
235 235 12 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 10:49 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
234 234 order Substitute Attorney Mon 11/18 1:59 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (DKT.231 ) by Judge Michelle Williams Court granting231 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven D. Park and Vincent Frank Tremonti terminated. (yl)
Related: [-]
233 233 order Substitute Attorney Mon 11/18 1:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court granting230 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Damian J Martinez terminated. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
232 232 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 11/12 10:51 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE ( 24-0167 approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Michelle Williams Court, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Honorable Michelle Williams Court for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-08787 MWC(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]