California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:22-cv-07637
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2023 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Illusion Smoke Shop, Inc
Defendant
Natascha Petrosians
Defendant
Mustafa Shaief
Plaintiff
GS Holistic, LLC
Represented By
Tomas Carlos Leon
Leon Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
47 47 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 02/28 5:10 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause46 Order by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
46 46 3 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 9:09 AM
ORDER to Show Cause Regarding Service by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
45 45 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Tue 08/27 8:18 PM
Supplemental Brief re39 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Defendant Basel Masoud Individuall and d/b/a Hotbox Smoke Shop ,41 Order filed byGS Holistic, LLC. Related [+] (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-] 39 ,41
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Affidavit
44 44 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 08/27 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GS Holistic, LLC re41 Order (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/21 12:17 PM
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief on Motion for Default Final Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 42 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 08/20 7:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief on Motion for Default Final Judgment filed by GS Holistic, LLC.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
41 41 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/06 3:21 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: for further briefing on 39 Motion for Default Judgment. (agtlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/15 11:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on39 motion for default is vacated and removed from Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse's 7/19/2024 calendar. The matter is under submission and the parties will be advised if the Court determines that a hearing is necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
39 39 motion Default Judgment - by the Court Fri 05/31 6:32 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Defendant Basel Masoud Individuall and d/b/a Hotbox Smoke Shop filed by GS Holistic, LLC. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 7/19/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 6/14/2024. Replies due by 6/21/2024.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Notice of Motion
Monday, May 20, 2024
38 38 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Mon 05/20 11:27 AM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Basel Masoud, individually and d/b/a Hotbox Smoke Shop. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)37
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
37 37 motion Entry of Default Tue 05/14 4:41 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Basel Masoud, individually and d/b/a Hotbox Smoke Shop filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/14 11:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Basel Masoud served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/13 6:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Nadim Maida by GS Holistic, LLC (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/14 9:06 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting in part and denying in part 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave and Extension of Time to Perfect Service. (agtlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
33 33 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/11 6:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Perfect Service Upon Defendants and Leave to Serve Defendant Basel Masoud Through U.S. Marshals as Timely Filed filed by GS Holistic, LLC.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Motion for leave for service Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Motion for leave for service Exhibit B
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
32 32 service Summons Issued Tue 09/12 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Nadim Maida, Basel Masoud. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/08 6:54 PM
NOTICE by GS Holistic, LLC of Dismissal of a Party (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 6:27 PM
Proposed Summons.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Remaining Summons
Thursday, September 07, 2023
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/07 5:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Basel Masoud, Nadim Maida. Filed byGS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Thu 09/07 2:13 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 27 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; denying as moot 23 Motion for Default Judgment. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
27 27 motion Set Aside Default Wed 09/06 11:19 AM
First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by GS Holistic, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 9/20/2023. Replies due by 9/27/2023.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 28, 2023
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Mon 08/28 12:50 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, filed by GS Holistic, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 9/11/2023. Replies due by 9/18/2023.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 13, 2023
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 07/13 2:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on23 motion for default judgment is rescheduled to 9/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. In addition, the initial case management conference is vacated and removed from Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse's 7/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 06/30 7:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on23 MOTION for Default Judgment is rescheduled to 7/21/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
23 23 motion Default Judgment - by the Court Mon 06/12 7:48 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to all Defendants filed by GS Holistic, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 6/26/2023. Replies due by 7/3/2023.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Affidavit,
Att: 5 Affidavit
Friday, May 19, 2023
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Fri 05/19 11:40 AM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Mustafa Shaief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+] (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s) 20
Friday, May 12, 2023
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 05/12 11:58 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 7/21/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. A case management conference statement must be filed no later than 7/14/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
20 20 motion Entry of Default Thu 05/11 4:54 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default against Mustafa Shaief filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Tue 04/18 5:34 PM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Illusion Smoke Shop, Inc, d/b/a Illusion Smoke Shop and Natascha Petrosians. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+] (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s) 18
Monday, April 10, 2023
18 18 motion Entry of Default Mon 04/10 8:06 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default against Illusion Smoke Shop, Inc d/b/a Illusion Smoke Shop and Natascha Petrosians filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/27 12:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Mustafa Shaief served on 3/26/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 03/07 11:12 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 5/19/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. A joint case management conference statement must be filed no later than 5/12/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/07 10:51 AM
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Perfect Service Upon Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 14 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 03/06 7:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Perfect Service Upon Defendants filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) Modified on 3/6/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 03, 2023
13 13 misc Case Management Statement Fri 03/03 4:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) Modified on 3/3/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/03 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Illusion Smoke Shop, Inc served on 3/2/2023, answer due 3/23/2023. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/03 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GS Holistic, LLC. Natascha Petrosians served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 03/03 8:49 AM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The initial case management conference, which is set for 3/10/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/agt] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
9 9 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 02/14 12:03 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 01/12 4:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Illusion Smoke Shop, Inc, Natascha Petrosians, Mustafa Shaief. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Thu 01/05 10:13 PM
Proposed Summons.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Remaining Summons,
Att: 2 Remaining Summons
Monday, December 19, 2022
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/19 2:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GS Holistic, LLC.. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 12/07 11:11 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/19/2022. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2022
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GS Holistic, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Chris Folkerts for GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17782189.). Filed byGS Holistic, LLC.(Leon, Tomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet