Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Terence P Kemp
Case #: 2:14-cv-01704
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2014
Terminated:Aug 12, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 12:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael V. Drake
Represented By
Michael Hiram Carpenter
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Caitlin E. Murphy
contact info
Timothy R Bricker
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph E. Steinmetz
1590 N. High St. Suite 500
Columbus, OH 43210
Represented By
Michael Hiram Carpenter
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Caitlin E. Murphy
contact info
Timothy R Bricker
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Ohio State University
1590 N. High St. Suite 500
Columbus, OH 43210
Represented By
Michael Hiram Carpenter
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Caitlin E. Murphy
contact info
Timothy R Bricker
Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan N. Waters
5299 Harbor Pointe Dr.
Galena, OH 43021
Represented By
Mark D Wagoner, Jr
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick
contact info
James M Petro
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
David Freeman Axelrod
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Katherine S Decker
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2015
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 4/24/2015. (jlg6)
GPO Sep 03 2015
ORDER - Within five business days, the party on whose behalf 63 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Annotated Privilege Log was filed shall submit, as appropriate, either an identical document with a name handwritten or submit the document by electronic means. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 9/3/2015. (agm)
GPO Dec 08 2015
ORDER - Defendants are ordered, within fourteen (14) days, to produce a copy of documents 3778 and 3779. The motion filed by Mr. Waters with respect to the privilege log (Doc. 58) is denied in all other respects. Mr. Waters motion(Doc. 65) for leave to file a corrected amended privilege log isgranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/8/2015. (agm)
GPO May 06 2016
ORDER granting 133 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/6/2016. (agm) Modified on 5/6/2016 to correct Motion ruling (agm).
GPO Aug 12 2016
OPINION AND ORDER - re 132 Sealed Document, 143 Sealed Document (Attorney Filing), filed by Jonathan N. Waters Terminating:(115 SEALED MOTION filed by Jonathan N. Waters.) Ohio States motion for summary judgement (Doc. #132) is GRANTED and Waters' motion for Rule 56(d) relief (Doc. #143) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 8/12/2016. (ds)
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
158 158 appeal USCA Order Tue 01/03 10:10 PM
ORDER of USCA as to157 Notice of Appeal: The parties have stipulated to dismiss this case. Note: No Mandate to issue . (er)
Related: [-]