Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Dave Lee Brannon
Case #: 0:14-cv-62226
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2014
Terminated:Mar 10, 2015
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 10:46 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Vapor 4 Life, Inc.
Represented By
Susan Meyer
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
Ungaretti & Harris, LLP
contact info
Kelly Rains Jesson
Weiss Serota Helfman
contact info
Counter Defendant
Richard Delisser
Represented By
Elliot Michael Zimmerman
Elliot Zimmerman
contact info
Charlotte Christine Towne
Charlotte Towne, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shaun Gutta
Represented By
Elliot Michael Zimmerman
Elliot Zimmerman
contact info
Charlotte Christine Towne
Charlotte Towne, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Vapor Life, LLC
Represented By
Elliot Michael Zimmerman
Elliot Zimmerman
contact info
Charlotte Christine Towne
Charlotte Towne, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Vapor 4 Life, Inc.
an Illinois corporation 4100 Commercial Ave.
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
Susan Meyer
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Jamie A. Robinson
Ungaretti & Harris, LLP
contact info
Kelly Rains Jesson
Weiss Serota Helfman
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Plaintiff
Vapor Life, LLC
a Florida limited liability company 100 Nighthawk Ave.
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
Elliot Michael Zimmerman
Elliot Zimmerman
contact info
Charlotte Christine Towne
Charlotte Towne, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
41 41 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/10 11:53 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/10/2015. (ls)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 03/10 8:45 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re39 Stipulation of Dismissal. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
39 39 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/09 10:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Richard Delisser, Shaun Gutta, Vapor Life, LLC(Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice
38 38 motion Dismiss Mon 03/09 10:50 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss13 Answer to Complaint,14 Counterclaim,1 Complaint,25 Answer to Counterclaim by Richard Delisser, Shaun Gutta, Vapor Life, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2015(Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order On Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice
37 37 adr Mediation Report Mon 03/09 4:52 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Leslie J. Lott. Disposition: Settled in full.(Lott, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
36 36 order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 02/03 4:25 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/3/2015. (sa)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/03 4:24 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2015. Discovery due by 5/11/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 2/9/2015. Motions due by 6/11/2015. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/3/2015. (sa)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 02/03 4:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on February 3, 2015. Charlotte Towne, Esq. and Elliot Zimmerman, Esq. present for Plaintiff/Counter-defendant. Kelly Rains Jesson, Esq., Susan Meyer, Esq., Jamie Robinson, Esq., and Roger Stein, Esq. present for Defendant/Counter-plaintiff. The Court also inquired as to the parties request for an extension to complete discovery. Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 15:00:49/26 mins.)(kmr)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 02/03 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Susan Meyer (Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/02 11:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying Amended Joint Motion to Extend Trial Date31 without prejudice. The Parties may re-raise their request for a continuance after mediation has concluded. The Court leaves to the Parties' discretion whether to conduct discovery in light of advancing deadlines, which shall remain in full force and effect after Judge Brannon's pretrial scheduling order is entered. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/2/2015. (bkd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 30, 2015
31 31 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/30 3:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Trial Date and Enter Proposed Pretrial Discovery Schedule (Amended) by Vapor 4 Life, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2015(Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Joint Planning and Scheduling Report,
Att: 2 Affidavit of E. Zimmerman,
Att: 3 Affidavit of S. Meyer
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/30 11:12 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice29 Motion for Extension of Time for noncompliance with the affidavit requirement of Local Rule 7.6. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/30/2015. (bkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 29, 2015
29 29 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/29 7:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Proposed Joint Planning and Scheduling Report by Vapor 4 Life, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2015(Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, January 08, 2015
28 28 order Order Thu 01/08 1:36 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/8/2015. (sa)
Related: [-]
27 27 order - Endorsed Order no pdf attached ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/08 10:49 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3:00 P.M. on Tuesday, February 3, 2015. At least 48 hours before the conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the Court (brannon@flsd.uscourts.gov) and opposing counsel with a dial-in conference call number. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time, but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/8/2015. (kmr)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/08 1:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2015 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. (sa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
26 26 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge Fri 12/19 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2015 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Scheduling Conference and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/19/2014. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 05, 2014
25 25 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 12/05 5:52 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Richard Delisser, Shaun Gutta, Vapor Life, LLC. (Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/05 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlotte Christine Towne on behalf of Vapor Life, LLC. Attorney Charlotte Christine Towne added to party Vapor Life, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Charlotte Christine Towne added to party Vapor Life, LLC(pty:cd). (Towne, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/05 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlotte Christine Towne on behalf of Richard Delisser. Attorney Charlotte Christine Towne added to party Richard Delisser(pty:cd). (Towne, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 12/05 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlotte Christine Towne on behalf of Shaun Gutta. Attorney Charlotte Christine Towne added to party Shaun Gutta(pty:cd). (Towne, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 21, 2014
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/21 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elliot Michael Zimmerman on behalf of Shaun Gutta. Attorney Elliot Michael Zimmerman added to party Shaun Gutta(pty:cd). (Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/21 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elliot Michael Zimmerman on behalf of Richard Delisser. Attorney Elliot Michael Zimmerman added to party Richard Delisser(pty:cd). (Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 20, 2014
19 19 service Summons Issued Thu 11/20 7:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Shaun Gutta. (asl)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Thu 11/20 7:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Richard Delisser. (asl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 11/19 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Issuance by Vapor 4 Life, Inc. re14 Counterclaim filed by Vapor 4 Life, Inc. (Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Wed 11/19 12:54 PM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on14 Counterclaim into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Richard Delisser and Shaun Gutta. (Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 11/19 11:19 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re14 Counterclaim. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties Related [+]. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (asl)
Related: [-] Richard Delisser and Shaun Gutta
14 14 cmp Counterclaim Wed 11/19 11:12 AM
COUNTERCLAIM against Vapor Life, LLC, filed by Vapor 4 Life, Inc..(Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/19 10:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Vapor 4 Life, Inc.. Attorney Susan Meyer added to party Vapor 4 Life, Inc.(pty:dft). (Meyer, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 24, 2014
12 12 ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice8 . James A. Robinson, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendant Vapor 4 Life, Inc. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mr. Robinson at jarobinson@uhlaw.com. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/24/2014. (jrz)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jamie A. Robinson. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/24/2014. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 23, 2014
10 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kendall Enyard. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5927. Document Filed in Wrong Case ; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 14-62418 MC-RLR. (ra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 22, 2014
9 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kendall Enyard. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5927. Document Filed in Wrong Case ; Document restricted (ksa) Modified Text on 10/23/2014 (ra).
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jamie A. Robinson. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5924. (ksa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 16, 2014
7 7 ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer RE: Complaints re1 Complaint Vapor 4 Life, Inc. answer due 11/19/2014.. Re:1 Complaint filed by Vapor Life, LLC. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/16/2014. (ls)
Related: [-]
6 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re1 Complaint Or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by Vapor 4 Life, Inc.. Attorney Kelly Rains Jesson added to party Vapor 4 Life, Inc.(pty:dft).(Jesson, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 01, 2014
5 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Vapor Life, LLC. Vapor 4 Life, Inc. served on 9/29/2014, answer due 10/20/2014. (Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 29, 2014
4 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (vjk)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Vapor 4 Life, Inc. (vjk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 27, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against Vapor 4 Life, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7108749, filed by Vapor Life, LLC.(Zimmerman, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons
Friday, September 26, 2014
2 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon (vjk)
Related: [-]