Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: Mark J Dinsmore
Case #: 1:22-cv-02356
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 04, 2023 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
IMC COMPANIES- NATIONAL ACCOUNTS, LLC, f/k/a IMC GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
Daniel R. Kelley
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Tyler Jackson Mitchell
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Defendant
INTERMODAL CARTAGE CO,. LLC. d/b/a INTERMODAL CARTAGE, LLC
Represented By
Daniel R. Kelley
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Tyler Jackson Mitchell
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Defendant
MASTERBRAND CABINETS LLC
Defendant
MILE HIGH LOGISTICS, LLC
Defendant
OLD TIME POTTERY, LLC
Plaintiff
QFS TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By
Darren Andrew Craig
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Katherine Mary Frances Slisz
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info

GPO May 05 2023
ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's motion to amend 31 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Within fourteen days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint in substantially the same form as that found at Document Number 31-1 (plus exhibits), except that Plaintiff shall remove the claims under Section 13706 and the allegations regarding federal question jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall either add allegations sufficient to demonstrate the existence of diversity jurisdiction or, if it is unable to do so in good faith, it shall file a motion to remand on the same date as it files the Amended Complaint. The motion to remand shall set forth all information necessary to establish the citizenship of each Consignee Defendant.Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Dkt. 38, and Defendants' Motion for Oral Argument and Hearing Dkt. 39 are DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 05/04/2023. (AAS)
GPO Sep 08 2023
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO RECONSIDER: For the reasons set forth, Defendants' Renewed Motion to Reconsider Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 102 is DENIED. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/8/2023. (GD) (Main Document 116 replaced on 9/8/2023) (GD).

Docket last updated: 12/07/2022 12:21 AM EST
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dearborn County Superior Court, case number 15C01-2211-PL-000053, filed by Intermodal Cartage Co., LLC, IMC Companies - National Accounts, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7399634)(Mitchell, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 303 pgs State Court Record State Court Record (Appearance of Counsel, Complaint and exhibits thereto, and summons)
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Jackson Mitchell on behalf of Defendants IMC Companies - National Accounts, LLC, Intermodal Cartage Co., LLC. (Mitchell, Tyler)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by IMC Companies - National Accounts, LLC identifying Other Affiliate IMC Holding, LLC for IMC Companies - National Accounts, LLC.. (Mitchell, Tyler)
Related: [-]
4 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Intermodal Cartage Co., LLC identifying Other Affiliate IMC Holding, LLC for Intermodal Cartage Co., LLC.. (Mitchell, Tyler)
Related: [-]