New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:22-cv-10333
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2022
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 04, 2023 5:04 AM EDT
Petitioner
Sebastien Funez Mene
Represented By
Michael Salvatore Pascazi
Pascazi Law Offices
contact info
Respondent
Kaja Funez Sokola
Fulton & Gold Street
New York, NY 10038
Represented By
Vincent Gregory Levy
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Jonathan Schaffer-Goddard
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Richard Min
Green Kaminer Min & Rockmore LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
178 178 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 12/16 5:08 PM
ORDER terminating176 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court has reviewed Respondent's letter motion for leave to file a sur-reply (Dkt. #176), and Petitioner's response (Dkt. #177). The Court considers briefing in the instant matter to be concluded and will reach out to the parties if it concludes that any additional information is necessary. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 176.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/16/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
177 177 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/10 2:52 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Pascazi dated December 10, 2024 re:176 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Richard Min dated December 6, 2024. . Document filed by Sebastien Funez Mene..(Pascazi, Michael)
Related: [-]